Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 1.997 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Defendant: 1.997 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida, Nextel South Corp., Wyolene Coralie Taylor Bivins, Unknown Owners, Brian Bivins, Wyolene T Bivins and SBA 2012 TC Assets, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00237
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER dismissing action without prejudice. The Clerk shall close the file and terminate any pending deadlines. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 4/23/2021. (JHC)
April 14, 2021 Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 4/14/2021 (KKH).
April 9, 2021 Filing 23 Joint NOTICE of settlement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 4/12/2021 (KKH).
April 8, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2021. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responses in Opposition to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on or before April 15, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/2/2021. (TAM)
April 2, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. (JW)
April 2, 2021 Filing 19 SBA 2012 TC Assets, LLC's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by SBA 2012 TC Assets, LLC.(Maloney, Christopher)
April 1, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by 1.997 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida, Brian Bivins, Wyolene T Bivins, Wyolene Coralie Taylor Bivins. (DeGel, Summer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
April 1, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Summer Elaine DeGel on behalf of 1.997 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida, Brian Bivins, Wyolene T Bivins, Wyolene Coralie Taylor Bivins (DeGel, Summer)
March 22, 2021 Filing 16 RETURN of service as to Wyolene T. Bivins, executed on 3/15/21 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 3/23/2021 (KKH).
March 22, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN of service, as to Brian Bivins, executed on 3/15/21 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 3/23/2021 (KKH).
March 22, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN of service, as to Wyolene Coralie Taylor Bivins, executed on 3/15/21 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 3/23/2021 (KKH).
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of service as to Nextel South Corp, executed on 3/12/21 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 3/23/2021 (KKH).
March 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (SMS)
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of counsel of Diligent Search and the Need to Serve by Publication by Prineet D. Sharma on behalf of Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:21-cv-0237-TJC-JBT. (SJB)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for oral argument re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Porter re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Sharma, Prineet) (Corrected PDF attachment(s) added on 3/10/2021) (SMS).
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Diego Aponte re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Sharma, Prineet) (Corrected PDF attachment(s) added on 3/10/2021) (SMS).
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Adam Broad re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Sharma, Prineet) (Corrected PDF attachment(s) added on 3/10/2021) (SMS).
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citrus LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Inc., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Partners L.P for Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC.. (Sharma, Prineet) (Corrected PDF attachment(s) added on 3/10/2021) (SMS).
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17979121) filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint)(Sharma, Prineet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 1.997 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.997 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida
Represented By: Summer Elaine DeGel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nextel South Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyolene Coralie Taylor Bivins
Represented By: Kent Lee Hipp
Represented By: Summer Elaine DeGel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Bivins
Represented By: Kent Lee Hipp
Represented By: Summer Elaine DeGel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyolene T Bivins
Represented By: Kent Lee Hipp
Represented By: Summer Elaine DeGel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBA 2012 TC Assets, LLC
Represented By: Brandon Clark Meadows
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Prineet D. Sharma
Represented By: Igmedio E. Pantaleon
Represented By: Ivonne Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?