Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.427 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Defendant: Rosa Lee Smoke, Willie Scott, 0.427 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida, Unknown Owners, Rosa Scott Smoke, Rosa Scott-Smoke and Unknown Heirs and Beneficiaries of the Estate of Willie Scott
Case Number: 3:2021cv00250
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Rosa Lee Smoke. (Brigham, Andrew)
May 6, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Rosa Lee Smoke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A. Initial Offer 12.14.20 PUTN-007 Smoke, #2 Exhibit Exh B. Durrance App Rpt 12.05.20 PUTN-007 Smoke)(Brigham, Andrew)
May 5, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Unknown Heirs and Beneficiaries of the Estate of Willie Scott, Unknown Owners by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
April 21, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Rosa Lee Smoke.(Brigham, Andrew)
April 16, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #18 Order, . (Sharma, Prineet)
April 15, 2021 Filing 19 PROOF of publication filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Newspaper: Palatka Daily News Date(s) of publication 03/25/2021; 04/01/2021; 04/08/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OMNIBUS ORDER setting briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions for Preliminary Injunction. A hearing on the motions is set for June 2, 2021, at 3:00 P.M. before the Honorable Marcia Morales Howard. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/15/2021. (JHC)
April 8, 2021 Filing 17 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2021. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to Complaint and to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendant Rosa Lee Smoke shall respond to the Complaint and to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on or before April 21, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/2/2021. (DLC)
April 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. (JW)
March 31, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint, and Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Rosa Lee Smoke. (Brigham, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF of service executed on 3/17/2021 as to Rosa Lee Smoke by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/23/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 19, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of counsel of Diligent Search and the Need to Serve by Publication by Prineet D. Sharma on behalf of Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (SMS)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:21-cv-0250-MMH-MCR. (SJB)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for oral argument re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Porter re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Diego Aponte re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Adam Broad re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citrus LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Inc., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Partners L.P for Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC.. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17986133) filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint)(Sharma, Prineet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.427 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Lee Smoke
Represented By: Edward Scott Copeland
Represented By: Andrew Prince Brigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.427 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Scott Smoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Scott-Smoke
Represented By: Edward Scott Copeland
Represented By: Andrew Prince Brigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs and Beneficiaries of the Estate of Willie Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Prineet D. Sharma
Represented By: Igmedio E. Pantaleon
Represented By: Ivonne Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?