Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.962 Acres of Land in Union County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Defendant: Faye Luke, 0.962 Acres of Land in Union County, Florida, American Telephone & Telegraph Company, Unknown Owners and Gary E. Luke
Case Number: 3:2021cv00273
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Brian J Davis
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 29 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Unknown Owners (KEM)
May 5, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Unknown Owners by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
April 30, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Disclaimer of Interest by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1)(Sharma, Prineet)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 AT&T's second unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to #1 the complaint. AT&T must respond to the complaint by April 29, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/22/2021. (KNR)
April 19, 2021 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by American Telephone & Telegraph Company. (Boese, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
April 16, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #23 Order, . (Sharma, Prineet)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OMNIBUS ORDER setting briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions for Preliminary Injunction. A hearing on the motions is set for June 2, 2021, at 3:00 P.M. before the Honorable Marcia Morales Howard. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/15/2021. (JHC)
April 13, 2021 Filing 22 PROOF of publication filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Newspaper: Union County Times Date(s) of publication 03/25/2021; 04/01/2021; 04/08/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
April 8, 2021 Filing 21 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2021. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 AT&T's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to #1 the complaint. AT&T must respond to the complaint by April 20, 2021, if no omnibus order is entered setting a different deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/7/2021. (KNR)
April 6, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by American Telephone & Telegraph Company. (Boese, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
April 2, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. (JW)
March 25, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Tomkiewicz on behalf of Faye Luke, Gary E. Luke (Tomkiewicz, Michael)
March 25, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Faye Luke, Gary E. Luke.(Tomkiewicz, Michael)
March 22, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN of service as to Faye Luke executed on 3/18/2021 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified on 3/23/2021 to edit docket text. (KEM).
March 22, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN of service as to Gary E. Luke executed on 3/18/2021 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified on 3/23/2021 to edit docket text (KEM).
March 18, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of counsel of Diligent Search and the Need to Serve by Publication by Prineet D. Sharma on behalf of Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet)
March 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (SMS)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of service as to American Telephone and Telegraph Company executed on 3/15/2021 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified docket text on 3/18/2021 (KEM).
March 12, 2021 Filing 10 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:21-cv-0273-BJD-PDB. (SJB)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for oral argument re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Porter re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Diego Aponte re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Adam Broad re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citrus LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Inc., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Partners L.P for Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC.. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17993814) filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint)(Sharma, Prineet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.962 Acres of Land in Union County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faye Luke
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tomkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.962 Acres of Land in Union County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Telephone & Telegraph Company
Represented By: Andrew Benjamin Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary E. Luke
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tomkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Prineet D. Sharma
Represented By: Igmedio E. Pantaleon
Represented By: Ivonne Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?