Lail et al v. Miami Air International, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Miller, Ronald Azucenas, Benny Hernandez, Tyler Hall, Robert Harmon, Marcela Diaz, Scott Warrington, Mark Michaelson, Vicki Pehmoeller, Najah Garmo, Ernest Hunter, Mauritzio Levin, Robert Weaver, David Linder, Denise Futch, Tal-Beth Cohen, Randy Hall, Michael Hermanson, Eric Pehmoeller, Benjamin Futch, Joy Lail, Kristina Stoddard, Lydia Napier, Joseph Napier, William Wolfe and Lydia Corcoran
Defendant: Miami Air International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00413
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Miami Air International, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Levenson, Joshua)
June 2, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Miami Air International, Inc.. (Levenson, Joshua)
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.03 by Miami Air International, Inc.. (Levenson, Joshua)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Miami Air International, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and denying #10 Miami Air International, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant has not provided sufficient reasons for a 90-day extension. However, the Court will grant Defendant a 30-day extension, up to and including June 18, 2021 to respond to #1 the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 5/27/2021. (RLS)
May 25, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically For Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Ronald Azucenas, Tal-Beth Cohen, Marcela Diaz, Benjamin Futch, Denise Futch, Najah Garmo, Randy Hall, Tyler Hall, Robert Harmon, Michael Hermanson, Benny Hernandez, Ernest Hunter, Joy Lail, Mauritzio Levin, David Linder, Mark Michaelson, James Miller, Joseph Napier, Lydia Napier, Eric Pehmoeller, Vicki Pehmoeller, Kristina Stoddard, Scott Warrington, Robert Weaver, William Wolfe. (Bauer, Galen)
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically For Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Miami Air International, Inc.. (Levenson, Joshua)
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Ronald Azucenas, Tal-Beth Cohen, Marcela Diaz, Benjamin Futch, Denise Futch, Najah Garmo, Randy Hall, Tyler Hall, Robert Harmon, Michael Hermanson, Benny Hernandez, Ernest Hunter, Joy Lail, Mauritzio Levin, David Linder, Mark Michaelson, James Miller, Joseph Napier, Lydia Napier, Eric Pehmoeller, Vicki Pehmoeller, Kristina Stoddard, Scott Warrington, Robert Weaver, William Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Maynard, Keith)
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Miami Air International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Granting, In Part, Relief Stay Motions As To Certain Passengers / Claimants of Flight 293)(Levenson, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 04/28/2021 by all plaintiffs as to Miami Air International, Inc. (Maynard, Keith) (Modified on 5/7/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #1 Complaint,, by Ronald Azucenas, Tal-Beth Cohen, Marcela Diaz, Benjamin Futch, Denise Futch, Najah Garmo, Randy Hall, Tyler Hall, Robert Harmon, Michael Hermanson, Benny Hernandez, Ernest Hunter, Joy Lail, Mauritzio Levin, David Linder, Mark Michaelson, James Miller, Joseph Napier, Lydia Napier, Eric Pehmoeller, Vicki Pehmoeller, Kristina Stoddard, Scott Warrington, Robert Weaver, William Wolfe. (Maynard, Keith)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MD)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ronald Azucenas, Tal-Beth Cohen, Marcela Diaz, Benjamin Futch, Denise Futch, Najah Garmo, Randy Hall, Tyler Hall, Robert Harmon, Michael Hermanson, Benny Hernandez, Ernest Hunter, Joy Lail, Mauritzio Levin, David Linder, Mark Michaelson, James Miller, Joseph Napier, Lydia Napier, Eric Pehmoeller, Vicki Pehmoeller, Kristina Stoddard, Scott Warrington, Robert Weaver, William Wolfe. Related case(s): Yes (Maynard, Keith)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Miami Air International, Inc.. (JDR)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:21-cv-0413-TJC-JBT. (SJB)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Miami Air International, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18140844) filed by Robert Harmon, Eric Pehmoeller, Denise Futch, Kristina Stoddard, Mark Michaelson, Vicki Pehmoeller, Joy Lail, James Miller, Scott Warrington, David Linder, Benny Hernandez, Robert Weaver, Benjamin Futch, Ronald Azucenas, Randy Hall, Michael Hermanson, Lydia Napier, Ernest Hunter, Mauritzio Levin, Najah Garmo, Tal-Beth Cohen, William Wolfe, Joseph Napier, Tyler Hall, Marcela Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Maynard, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lail et al v. Miami Air International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Miller
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Azucenas
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Hernandez
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Hall
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Harmon
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcela Diaz
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Warrington
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Michaelson
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Pehmoeller
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Najah Garmo
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Hunter
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauritzio Levin
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Weaver
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Linder
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Futch
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tal-Beth Cohen
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Hall
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hermanson
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Pehmoeller
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Futch
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Lail
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Stoddard
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Napier
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Napier
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wolfe
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Corcoran
Represented By: Keith L. Maynard
Represented By: Robert F. Spohrer
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Air International, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Royas Levenson
Represented By: Lee P. Teichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?