Opielski v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Opielski
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00420
Filed: April 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by James Opielski. (Hewett, Christopher)
June 10, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 13 Order by James Opielski. (Hewett, Christopher)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER advising plaintiff that his certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement is overdue and must be filed no later than 7/9/2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 6/8/2021. (MD)
June 8, 2021 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Select mediator by 7/14/2021; Discovery deadline is 4/1/2022; Conduct mediation hearing by 4/15/2022; Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 5/6/2022; Pretrial statement due by 9/15/2022; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan; and, Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 10/3/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/8/2021. (MD)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 the plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the defendant's motion to dismiss. The plaintiff must respond to #7 the defendant's motion to dismiss by June 11, 2021. Future filings must comply with the Local Rules that went into effect on February 1, 2021, including Local Rule 1.08 governing typography (main text must be 2.0 double-spaced and Times New Roman is permitted if the main text is at least 14-point, with other requirements) and Local Rule 3.01(g) (certification must be under the heading "Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification"). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 5/28/2021. (BLW)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Castro, Jennifer)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Castro, Jennifer)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by James Opielski. (Hewett, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Castro, Jennifer)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MD)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Federal Civil Cover Sheet by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castro, Jennifer) (Modified on 4/20/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Jennifer Castro that Form JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet is required for the Clerk of Court to initiate a civil docket sheet. File the Civil Cover Sheet in this action using the Notice (Other) event. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Delta Air Lines, Inc. filed by James Opielski. (Originally Filed in State Court on 01/13/2021)(JDR)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:21-cv-0420-TJC-PDB. (SJB)
April 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court in and for Duval County, Florida, case number 16-2021-CA-000201-XXXX-MA filed in State Court on 01/13/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18147055 filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents Motion to Dismiss, #4 State Court Other Documents Nt. of Serving Rogs, #5 State Court Other Documents Req. for Admissions, #6 State Court Other Documents Req. to Prod., #7 State Court Other Documents Cert. of No Obj., #8 State Court Other Documents Nt. of Prod. of Non-Party, #9 State Court Other Documents Second Req. to Prod., #10 State Court Other Documents Req. for Copies, #11 State Court Other Documents Cert. of No. Obj., #12 State Court Other Documents Resp. to Req. for Admissions, #13 State Court Other Documents Am. Resp. Req. for Admissions, #14 State Court Other Documents Resp. to Req. for Prod., #15 State Court Other Documents Nt. of. Serving Ans. to Rogs, #16 State Court Other Documents Nt. of Prod. Non-Party, #17 State Court Other Documents Redacted Answers to Rogs, #18 State Court Other Documents Nt. of Prod. Non-Party)(Castro, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Opielski v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Opielski
Represented By: Christopher Hewett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Hara
Represented By: Jennifer Castro
Represented By: Christopher John Jahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?