The Okavage Group, LLC v. UWM Holdings Corporation et al
Plaintiff: THE OKAVAGE GROUP, LLC
Defendant: UWM HOLDINGS CORPORATION and MAT ISHBIA
Case Number: 3:2021cv00448
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Defendants' Dispositive Motion to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Goldstein, Glenn)
June 18, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), and 12(b)(6) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Goldstein, Glenn)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER: #14 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations is GRANTED. Defendants may file a motion to dismiss of no more than forty (40) substantive pages. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 6/10/2021. (AMP)
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages by Mat Ishbia, UWM Holdings Corporation. (Goldstein, Glenn)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including 6/18/2021 to file a response to the Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. 1).The proposed order attached to the Motion (Doc. No. 11-1) is STRICKEN, and the Clerk shall remove it from the electronic filing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 5/7/2021. (MDC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Avi Benayoun on behalf of Mat Ishbia, UWM Holdings Corporation (Benayoun, Avi)
May 6, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Mat Ishbia, UWM Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Glenn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 5/10/2021 - PDF of proposed order removed per Court Order. (AEP)
May 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Peral on behalf of Mat Ishbia, UWM Holdings Corporation (Peral, Stephanie)
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn E. Goldstein on behalf of Mat Ishbia, UWM Holdings Corporation (Goldstein, Glenn)
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF of service by The Okavage Group, LLC (Goodman, Robert)
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 05/04/2021 as to UWM Holdings Corporation by The Okavage Group, LLC (Goodman, Robert) Modified text on 5/5/2021. (AEP)
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Mat Ishbia, UWM Holdings Corporation. (AEP)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by The Okavage Group, LLC. (Goodman, Robert)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by The Okavage Group, LLC. (Goodman, Robert)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:21-cv-0448-BJD-JRK. (SJB)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18172317) filed by THE OKAVAGE GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Okavage Group, LLC v. UWM Holdings Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UWM HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Glenn E. Goldstein
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAT ISHBIA
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Glenn E. Goldstein
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE OKAVAGE GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Robert Henry Goodman
Represented By: Joseph E. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?