Florida Coastal School of Law v. Cardona et al
Plaintiff: Florida Coastal School of Law and Florida Coastal School of Law, Inc.
Defendant: Miguel Cardona and United States Department of Education
Case Number: 3:2021cv00721
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Miguel Cardona, United States Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CORRECTED ORDER denying #5 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law. (Entered to correct a non-substantive scrivener's error.) Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/9/2021. (JW)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #5 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/9/2021. (JW)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 8/4/2021; directing the Clerk of the Court to file under seal the Letter of Intent provided to chambers; taking under advisement #5 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (TMF) (Modified on 8/5/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Sealed Document, S-28. (BGR)
August 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER directing Florida Coastal School of Law to file, under seal, by 3:00 p.m. on August 2, 2021, the Letter of Intent with its Financial Partner along with all other agreements, documents, or information necessary for the Court to fully evaluate the import of the proposed transaction on the controversy presently before the Court. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/1/2021. (JW)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law filed by Florida Coastal School of Law, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3)(Obuchowicz, David)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Merrick Garland by Florida Coastal School of Law, Inc. (Dodd, Ashley) (Modified on 8/2/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service on United States Department of Education by Florida Coastal School of Law, Inc. (Dodd, Ashley) (Modified on 8/2/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Miguel Cardona by Florida Coastal School of Law, Inc. (Dodd, Ashley) (Modified on 8/2/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE by Miguel Cardona, United States Department of Education re #19 Declaration Notice of Erratum Regarding Exhibit C to Frola Declaration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correct Exhibit C to Frola Declaration)(Bickford, James)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Miguel Cardona, United States Department of Education. (Bickford, James)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECLARATION of Michael J. Frola by Miguel Cardona, United States Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Bickford, James)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING on #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 8/4/2021 at 02:00 PM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. (JW)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROOF of service executed on 7/22/2021 as to Karin Hoppman (U.S. Attorney's Office) by Florida Coastal School of Law, Inc. (Dodd, Ashley) (Modified on 7/28/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER: In Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction #5, the Court specifically directs Defendants to address whether the relief sought by Plaintiff would require the Court to issue an injunction requiring affirmative action by Defendants to effectuate full relief--i.e., whether any injunction issued by the Court would be a mandatory injunction or a prohibitive injunction. Plaintiff is likewise specifically directed to address this issue in its reply briefing. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 7/23/2021. (DKM)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint STATUS Report by Florida Coastal School of Law, Inc. (Burns, David) (Modified on 7/23/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/21/2021. Response due by 7:00 p.m. on July 28, 2021, and shall not exceed 55 pages. Reply due by 5:00 p.m. on July 30, 2021, and shall not exceed 15 pages. A preliminary injunction hearing will be set for August 4, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. or 2:00 p.m. Notice to enter. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law filed by Miguel Cardona, United States Department of Education. (Bickford, James)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James Bickford on behalf of Miguel Cardona, United States Department of Education (Bickford, James)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 #3 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. If David A. Obuchowicz, Esq. and Steven M. Gombos, Esq. have not already done so, they each shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 7/21/2021. (RLS)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 7/21/2021 at 04:30 PM before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. The hearing will be held via Zoom. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will separately send participants the Zoom link. (JW)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion to File Its Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Excess of Twenty-Five Pages and accepting as filed #5 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 7/21/2021. (JW)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Merrick Garland, Miguel Cardona, United States Department of Education, & Karin Hoppmann. (BGR)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Florida Coastal School of Law identifying Corporate Parent Infilaw Corporation, Corporate Parent Infilaw Holding, LLC for Florida Coastal School of Law. (Burns, David)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:21-cv-0721-MMH-JBT. (SJB)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law by Florida Coastal School of Law. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction)(Burns, David)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law by Florida Coastal School of Law. (Burns, David)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Steven M. Gombos to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18497782 for $150 by Florida Coastal School of Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burns, David)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for David A. Obuchowicz to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. BFLMDC-18497770 for $150 by Florida Coastal School of Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burns, David)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Emergency Injunctive Relief against Miguel Cardona, United States Department of Education (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18497652) filed by Florida Coastal School of Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Civil Cover Sheet, #24 Proposed Summons, #25 Proposed Summons, #26 Proposed Summons, #27 Proposed Summons)(Burns, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Coastal School of Law v. Cardona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Coastal School of Law
Represented By: David D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Coastal School of Law, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley A Dodd
Represented By: David A. Obuchowicz
Represented By: Steven M. Gombos
Represented By: David D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Cardona
Represented By: James Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: James Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?