Khan v. Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Awais M. Khan and Awais M. Khan, M.D.
Defendant: Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC, Nathan Walcker, Rich MacClary, Valerie Eastwood, Chris Purdy, Tara Ruska, Denice Veatch, Adam Derringer, Jason Coe and Lucio N. Gordon
Case Number: 3:2021cv00821
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Joint Unopposed Motion for 90-Day Stay. This case is stayed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close this case. Notice due January 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/1/2021. (JW)
September 30, 2021 Filing 35 Joint Unopposed MOTION to Stay for 90 Days by All Defendants. (Dunkle, Caroline) (Modified on 10/1/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying #12 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Notice due October 1, 2021. The Court Reporter is directed to file a transcript of the Court's pronouncement of its ruling. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/24/2021. (JW)
September 24, 2021 Filing 33 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 9/24/2021. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
September 17, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Awais M. Khan, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lorrinda Khan)(Chapman, Ronald)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Set a Single Response Date for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including 10/5/2021 to file responses to the First Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial (Doc. No. 9). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 9/14/2021. (MDC)
September 14, 2021 Filing 30 AMENDMENT to #28 Response in Opposition to Motion by Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stewart, Maureen) (Modified on 9/14/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
September 13, 2021 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside a Single Response Date for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint by Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC. (Dunkle, Caroline) (Modified on 9/14/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
September 13, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Stewart, Maureen)
September 13, 2021 Filing 27 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC. (Dunkle, Caroline)
September 3, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Awais M. Khan, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Y, #2 Exhibit Exhibit Z, #3 Exhibit Exhibit AA, #4 Exhibit Exhibit BB, #5 Exhibit Exhibit CC)(Chapman, Ronald) (Modified on 9/3/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
September 2, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF HEARING on #12 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/24/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. The hearing will be held via Zoom. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will separately provide participants with the Zoom link. (JW)
September 1, 2021 Filing 24 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/1/2021. Plaintiff's affidavit due September 6, 2021. Defendant's response due September 13, 2021. Plaintiff's reply due September 20, 2021. A preliminary injunction hearing is set for September 24, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. via Zoom. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
September 1, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Craig Dunkle on behalf of Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC (Dunkle, Caroline)
September 1, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard V. Feigel, Jr on behalf of Jason Coe, Adam Derringer, Valerie Eastwood, Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC, Lucio N. Gordon, Rich MacClary, Chris Purdy, Tara Ruska, Denice Veatch, Nathan Walcker (Feigel, Leonard)
August 31, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Mathis Stewart on behalf of Jason Coe, Adam Derringer, Valerie Eastwood, Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC, Lucio N. Gordon, Rich MacClary, Chris Purdy, Tara Ruska, Denice Veatch, Nathan Walcker (Stewart, Maureen)
August 31, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/1/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will separately send participants the call-in information. (JW)
August 31, 2021 Filing 19 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/31/2021. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
August 31, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS issued as to Jason Coe, Lucio N. Gordon. (BGR)
August 31, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Awais M. Khan, M.D.. (Chapman, Ronald)
August 31, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Awais M. Khan, M.D. (Chapman, Ronald) (Modified on 8/31/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
August 31, 2021 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Awais M. Khan, M.D.. (Chapman, Ronald)
August 31, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P Matthews on behalf of Jason Coe, Adam Derringer, Valerie Eastwood, Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC, Lucio N. Gordon, Rich MacClary, Chris Purdy, Tara Ruska, Denice Veatch, Nathan Walcker (Matthews, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER taking under advisement #12 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction as to Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC. Plaintiff shall promptly file a supplement which brings the Motion into full compliance with the Local Rules of this Court. Plaintiff shall promptly effect service of process on Defendants and file a notice with the Court advising that service has been accomplished. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/31/2021. (TMF)
August 30, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Awais M. Khan, M.D.. (Chapman, Ronald)
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 Disclosure Statement by Awais M. Khan. (Chapman, Ronald) (Modified on 8/30/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Awais M. Khan. (Chapman, Ronald) (Modified on 8/30/2021, counsel notified to refile completed summons forms) (BGR).
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Valerie Eastwood, Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC, Rich MacClary, Chris Purdy, Tara Ruska, Nathan Walcker, Jason Coe, Lucio N. Gordon with Jury Demand. filed by Awais M. Khan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit Exhibit X)(Chapman, Ronald)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 TRANSFER IN from Fort Myers Division on 08/23/2021 Case Number 2:21-cv-619. Case assigned to District Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New Case Number: 3:21-cv-821-MMH-JRK. (BGR)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED: The Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this action to the Jacksonville Division of the Middle District of Florida and close the case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/23/2021. (AEH)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Adam Derringer, Valerie Eastwood, Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC, Rich MacClary, Chris Purdy, Tara Ruska, Denice Veatch, Nathan Walcker. (RMT)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Awais M. Khan. (Chapman, Ronald)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/19/2021. (JK)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-619-SPC-MRM. (LRB)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adam Derringer, Valerie Eastwood, Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC, Rich MacClary, Chris Purdy, Tara Ruska, Denice Veatch, Nathan Walcker with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18607350) filed by Awais M. Khan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit Exhibit BB)(Chapman, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Awais M. Khan
Represented By: Sara A. Bazzigaluppi
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Awais M. Khan, M.D.
Represented By: Sara A. Bazzigaluppi
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Cancer Specialists & Research Institute, LLC
Represented By: Michael P Matthews
Represented By: Caroline Craig Dunkle
Represented By: Leonard V. Feigel, Jr.
Represented By: Maureen Mathis Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Walcker
Represented By: Michael P Matthews
Represented By: Caroline Craig Dunkle
Represented By: Leonard V. Feigel, Jr.
Represented By: Maureen Mathis Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich MacClary
Represented By: Michael P Matthews
Represented By: Caroline Craig Dunkle
Represented By: Leonard V. Feigel, Jr.
Represented By: Maureen Mathis Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Eastwood
Represented By: Michael P Matthews
Represented By: Caroline Craig Dunkle
Represented By: Leonard V. Feigel, Jr.
Represented By: Maureen Mathis Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Purdy
Represented By: Michael P Matthews
Represented By: Caroline Craig Dunkle
Represented By: Leonard V. Feigel, Jr.
Represented By: Maureen Mathis Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Ruska
Represented By: Michael P Matthews
Represented By: Caroline Craig Dunkle
Represented By: Leonard V. Feigel, Jr.
Represented By: Maureen Mathis Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denice Veatch
Represented By: Michael P Matthews
Represented By: Leonard V. Feigel, Jr.
Represented By: Maureen Mathis Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Derringer
Represented By: Michael P Matthews
Represented By: Leonard V. Feigel, Jr.
Represented By: Maureen Mathis Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Coe
Represented By: Michael P Matthews
Represented By: Caroline Craig Dunkle
Represented By: Leonard V. Feigel, Jr.
Represented By: Maureen Mathis Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucio N. Gordon
Represented By: Michael P Matthews
Represented By: Caroline Craig Dunkle
Represented By: Leonard V. Feigel, Jr.
Represented By: Maureen Mathis Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?