Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Irish Aiden LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Irish Aiden LLC d/b/a Scruffy Murphy's, Portia Patrick and Irish Aiden LLC doing business as Scruffy Murphy's
Case Number: 3:2021cv00996
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James R Klindt
Referring Judge: Laura Lothman Lambert
2 Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 11/24/2021 as to Portia Patrick by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Giles, Brian) Modified text on 12/3/2021. (AEP)
December 2, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 12/02/2021 as to Irish Aiden LLC d/b/a Scruffy Murphy's by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Giles, Brian) Modified text on 12/3/2021. (AEP)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:21-cv-996-HES-LLL. Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Irish Aiden LLC, Portia Patrick. (KEM)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:21-cv-0996-HES-JRK. (SJB)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Irish Aiden LLC d/b/a Scruffy Murphy's, Portia Patrick (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18784784) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Giles, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Irish Aiden LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Brian T. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irish Aiden LLC d/b/a Scruffy Murphy's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portia Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irish Aiden LLC doing business as Scruffy Murphy's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?