Vassallo v. The Park at Anzio et al
Plaintiff: Louis Vassallo
Defendant: The Park at Anzio, Blue Rock Premier Properties, LLC doing business as Blue Roc Premier Properties, LLC, Blue Rock Premier Properties, LLC doing business as Blue Roc Premier also known as Blue Roc Premier Properties, LLC, Blue Rock Premier, LLC doing business as Blue Roc Premier, LLC and Blue Roc Premier Properties, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01093
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Laura Lothman Lambert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #6 Amended Complaint by Blue Rock Premier Properties, LLC, Blue Rock Premier, LLC, The Park at Anzio.(Bourff, Natalie)
December 6, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF of service executed on 11/30/2021 by Louis Vassallo as to Blue Rock Premier Properties, LLC (Cunningham, Juan) (Modified on 12/6/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Defendants, The Park at Anzio and Blue Rock Premier Properties, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including 12/13/2021 to file a response to the Amended Complaint (Doc. 6). Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 11/30/2021. (MDC)
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Bourff, Natalie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 CASE Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:21-cv-1093-MMH-JRK. Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt no longer assigned to the case. (LRB)
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF of service executed on 11/8/2021 by Louis Vassallo as to The Park at Anzio (Cunningham, Juan) (Modified on 11/12/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to The Park at Anzio. (BGR)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Louis Vassallo as to The Park at Anzio. (Cunningham, Juan) (Modified on 11/8/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Blue Rock Premier Properties, LLC. (BGR)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blue Rock Premier, LLC, The Park at Anzio filed by Louis Vassallo. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Louis Vassallo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet (corrected), #2 Proposed Summons Summons to The Park at Anzio, #3 Proposed Summons Summons to Blue Rock)(Cunningham, Juan) (Modified on 11/4/2021, counsel notified new summons cannot be issued to party previously served without proof of service) (BGR).
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to The Park at Anzio. (BGR)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Louis Vassallo re #1 Complaint of filing Proposed Summonses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Proposed Summonses)(Cunningham, Juan) (Modified on 11/2/2021, counsel notified one party on summons doesn't exactly match complaint and cannot be issued) (BGR).
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:21-cv-1093-MMH-JRK. (SJB)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Rock Premier Properties, LLC, The Park at Anzio (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18874104) filed by Louis Vassallo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons Anzio, #3 Proposed Summons Summons Blue Roc)(Cunningham, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vassallo v. The Park at Anzio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Vassallo
Represented By: Juan Courtney Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Park at Anzio
Represented By: Amy Leigh Baker
Represented By: Natalie Christian Bourff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Rock Premier Properties, LLC doing business as Blue Roc Premier Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Rock Premier Properties, LLC doing business as Blue Roc Premier also known as Blue Roc Premier Properties, LLC
Represented By: Amy Leigh Baker
Represented By: Natalie Christian Bourff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Rock Premier, LLC doing business as Blue Roc Premier, LLC
Represented By: Natalie Christian Bourff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Roc Premier Properties, LLC
Represented By: Amy Leigh Baker
Represented By: Natalie Christian Bourff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?