Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Sims
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Sha'ron A. Sims
Case Number: 3:2021cv01128
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
2 Judge: Brian J Davis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #8 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal/Petition for Writ, #2 Motion to Consolidate)(SJW)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Sha'ron A. Sims. Filing fee not paid. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 C, #4 G) (Titled: Petition for Writ of Mandamus)(SJW)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER remanding case to the Fourth Judicial Circuit, in and for Duval County, Florida, and denying #2 Motion to Pay Docketing Fees Through Installments. The Clerk should close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 11/24/2021. (AGB)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 CASE Reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. New case number: 3:21-cv-1128-TJC-PDB. Judge Brian J. Davis no longer assigned to the case. (LRB)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable Timothy J. Corrigan for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(a)(2)(A). Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/16/2021. (CKS)
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County, case number 2015-CA-3618 filed by Sha'ron A. Sims.(AEP)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to pay docketing fees through installments by Sha'ron A. Sims. (AEP)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, Duval County, case number 2015-CA-3618 filed by Sha'ron A. Sims. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sha'ron A. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?