McEachern et al v. E.R.J. Insurance Group et al
Plaintiff: John Nelson Patrick McEachern and Blue Dealer Services, Inc.
Defendant: ERJ Insurance Group, American Heritage Insurance Services, Pablo Creek Services, Incv,, E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc. doing business as American Heritage Insurance Services and Pablo Creek Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00023
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0009 Motion to confirm arbitration award
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case to the Honorable James R. Klindt, as the Magistrate Judge, for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(a)(2)(A). Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/7/2022. (ADM)
March 1, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Dismiss Duplicate Proceeding or Alternative Motion to Stay or Abate This Case filed by Blue Dealer Services, Inc., John Nelson Patrick McEachern. (Kent, William)
February 23, 2022 Filing 13 CASE Reassigned to Judge Brian J. Davis. New case number: 3:22-cv-23-BJD-MCR. Judge Timothy J. Corrigan no longer assigned to the case. (LRB)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(a)(2)(A), this case is TRANSFERRED to the Honorable Brian J. Davis, with his consent. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 2/17/2022. (KKH)
February 9, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Duplicate Proceeding or Alternative MOTION to Stay or Abate This Case by E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., Pablo Creek Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Dismiss Complaint)(Carey, Brett) (Modified on 2/10/2022, to edit text) (BGR).
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. If Dione C. Greene, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/2/2022. (ADM)
February 1, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Dione C. Greene to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19181001 for $150 by Blue Dealer Services, Inc., John Nelson Patrick McEachern. (Kent, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award is due February 9, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/21/2022. (ADM)
January 20, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award by E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., Pablo Creek Services, Inc.. (Carey, Brett) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
January 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., Pablo Creek Services, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Carey, Brett)
January 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Carey on behalf of E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., Pablo Creek Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service E-Mail)(Carey, Brett)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Dione C. Greene Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AEP)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:22-cv-0023-TJC-MCR. Motion(s) REFERRED: #1 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (SJB)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in support re #1 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Blue Dealer Services, Inc., John Nelson Patrick McEachern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, McEachern Notarized Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2, ERJ Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3, Pablo Creek Services Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4, Arbitration Demand, #5 Exhibit 5, Prior Arbitration Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 6, Letters, #7 Exhibit 7, Allstate emails re Arbitrationn, #8 Exhibit 8, Motion and Memo, #9 Exhibit 9, MSE Dist. v. Southwest Reinsure, #10 Exhibit 10, Final Arbitration Award, #11 Exhibit 11, Email re Separate Action, #12 Exhibit 12, Index of Exhibits for Motion to Confirm)(Kent, William)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award by All Plaintiffs. (Kent, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McEachern et al v. E.R.J. Insurance Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nelson Patrick McEachern
Represented By: William Mallory Kent
Represented By: Dione C. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Dealer Services, Inc.
Represented By: William Mallory Kent
Represented By: Dione C. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERJ Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Heritage Insurance Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Creek Services, Incv,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc. doing business as American Heritage Insurance Services
Represented By: Brett Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Creek Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brett Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?