Gorman et al v. Tidewater Equipment company et al
Plaintiff: Robert G. Gorman, III and Shelby Gorman
Defendant: Tidewater Equipment Company, Jason Kimbrell, Jr. and Jason Carlos Kimbrell, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00197
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Supplement #12 Response in Opposition to Motion Plaintiff'sSupplemental Motion to Strike Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Jason Carlos Kimbrell, Jr.. (Achem, Sami)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Discovery due by 1/5/2023. Dispositive motions due by 1/5/2023. Conduct mediation hearing by 2/10/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 6/5/2023 at 09:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 3/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Court Docket)(JW)
March 28, 2022 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Kirch, Janeen)
March 28, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Robert G. Gorman, III, Shelby Gorman. (Kirch, Janeen)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Defendant, Jason Carlos Kimbrell, Jr.'s Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Supplemental Motion to Strike Count III of Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including April 11, 2022 to file a reply, which shall not exceed seven pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 3/22/2022. (AJS)
March 21, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Supplement #12 Response in Opposition to Motion Plaintiff'sSupplemental Motion to Strike Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint by Jason Carlos Kimbrell, Jr.. (Achem, Sami) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
March 18, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Response by Jason Carlos Kimbrell, Jr., Tidewater Equipment Company. (Achem, Sami)
March 11, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 First MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages filed by Robert G. Gorman, III, Shelby Gorman. (Richard, Benjamin)
March 10, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE: Upon review of #10 Defendants' Amended Notice of Removal, the Court's sua sponte inquiry into its subject matter jurisdiction is satisfied. (MHM)
March 4, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NASSAU COUNTY, case number 22CA0024 filed in State Court on 02/18/2022. filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Achem, Sami) (Modified on 3/4/2022, to edit text) (BGR). (Modified on 3/22/2022 to edit docket text per Chambers) (JDR).
February 28, 2022 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to Strike by Jason Kimbrell, Jr. (Achem, Sami) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Modified on 3/1/2022, to edit text) (BGR).
February 28, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike filed by Jason Kimbrell, Jr.(Achem, Sami) (Modified on 3/1/2022, to edit text) (BGR).
February 28, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses; re #3 Complaint, #1 Notice of Condemnation Notice of Removal by Tidewater Equipment Company. (Achem, Sami) (Modified on 3/1/2022, to edit text) (BGR).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED: Exhibit B to the Notice is STRICKEN and the Clerk of the Court is directed to remove these records from the Court docket. Defendants shall have up to and including March 10, 2022, to file an amended notice of removal which provides the Court with sufficient information so that it can determine whether it has diversity jurisdiction over this action. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 2/25/2022. (MHM)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Achem, Sami) (Modified on 2/24/2022, to edit text) (BGR).
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Redacted Exhibits to the Notice of Removal filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit B)(Achem, Sami) (Modified on 2/28/2022, EXHIBIT B is STRICKEN and removed per #6 Order) (BGR).
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Jason Kimbrell, Jr, Tidewater Equipment Company with Jury Demand filed by Robert G. Gorman, III, Shelby Gorman. (Originally filed in Nassau County Circuit Court on 1/24/2022.)(BGR)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW)
February 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State Court, case number 22CA0024 filed in State Court on 02/18/2022. filed by Jason Kimbrell, Jr, Tidewater Equipment company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit A)(Achem, Sami) (Modified on 2/28/2022, EXHIBIT B is STRICKEN and removed per #6 Order) (BGR).
February 22, 2022 FEES paid by Jason Kimbrell, Jr, Tidewater Equipment Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number JAX035520) (BGR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorman et al v. Tidewater Equipment company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G. Gorman, III
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Janeen Marie Kirch
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Gorman
Represented By: Curry Gary Pajcic
Represented By: Janeen Marie Kirch
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidewater Equipment Company
Represented By: Sami R. Achem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kimbrell, Jr.
Represented By: Sami R. Achem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Carlos Kimbrell, Jr.
Represented By: Sami R. Achem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?