Coker et al v. Warren et al
Plaintiff: Befaithful Coker, V. C. and M. C.
Defendant: Northeast Florida Newspaper, LLC, Slyvester Warren, III, Justice and Equality Coalition, Incorporated, City Council of Lake City Florida, Jake Hill, Eugene Jefferson, Christopher Todd Sampson, Stephen Witt, Audrey Sikes, Tomi Brown, Fred Koberlein, Jr., Koberlein Law Office, Robinson, Keenon, and Kendrow, PA, Joel Foreman, Columbia County Board of County Commissioners, Ronald Williams, Lake City, Columbia County Chamber of Commerce, Steve Smith, Lake City Reporter, Todd Wilson, Stephen Douglas, Glennel Bowden, Vanessa George, Nathan Gambles, III, Kris Robinson, David Fina, Florida Secretary of State and Kris Bradshaw Robinson
Case Number: 3:2022cv00518
Filed: May 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Laura Lothman Lambert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER directing Defendants Northeast Florida Newspaper and Todd Wilson to file a supplement to their #15 Motion to Dismiss with the requisite Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification on or before July 13, 2022. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 6/30/2022. (MHM)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE to the Court and MOTION to Receive Access by Befaithful Coker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BGR)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #16 Defendant Kris B. Robinson's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Response to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Defendant Robinson shall file a certificate of compliance with Local Rule 3.01(g) on or before 7/6/2022 or the motion may be denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 6/30/2022. (MDC)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re #10 Third Amended Complaint by Kris Bradshaw Robinson. (Robinson, Kris) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. (Modified on 6/30/2022, to edit text) (BGR).
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss The Case Against Them by Northeast Florida Newspaper, LLC, Todd Wilson. (Rathet, Brooks)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks C. Rathet on behalf of Northeast Florida Newspaper, LLC, Todd Wilson (Rathet, Brooks)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Defendant City of Lake City's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Lake City Defendants to File Response to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Defendants Audrey Sikes, City Council of Lake City Florida, Christopher Todd Sampson, Jake Hill, Eugene Jefferson, Stephen Witt and Fred Koberlein, Jr. shall have up to and including 7/18/2022 to file a response to the Third Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, doc. 10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 6/28/2022. (MDC)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RETURN of service executed on 6/10/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Vanessa George. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RETURN of service executed on 6/8/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Nathan Gambles, III. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RETURN of service executed on 6/6/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Stephen Witt. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RETURN of service executed on 6/8/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Kris Bradshaw Robinson. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RETURN of service executed on 6/6/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Glennel Bowden. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RETURN of service executed on 6/7/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Stephen Douglas. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RETURN of service executed on 6/10/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Steve Smith. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RETURN of service executed on 6/8/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Lake City, Columbia County Chamber of Commerce. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RETURN of service executed on 6/8/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Ronald Williams. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RETURN of service executed on 6/8/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Columbia County Board of County Commissioners. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RETURN of service executed on 6/8/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Robinson, Keenon, and Kendrow, PA. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RETURN of service executed on 6/6/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Koberlein Law Office. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RETURN of service executed on 6/6/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Fred Koberlein, Jr. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RETURN of service executed on 6/7/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Tomi Brown. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RETURN of service executed on 6/6/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Audrey Sikes. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RETURN of service executed on 6/6/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Christopher Todd Sampson. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RETURN of service executed on 6/6/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Eugene Jefferson. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RETURN of service executed on 6/6/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Jake Hill. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on 6/6/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to City Council of Lake City Florida. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RETURN of service executed on 6/6/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Justice and Equality Coalition, Incorporated. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on 6/6/2022 by Befaithful Coker as to Slyvester Warren, III. (BD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by City Council of Lake City Florida, Jake Hill, Eugene Jefferson, Fred Koberlein, Jr, Christopher Todd Sampson, Audrey Sikes, Stephen Witt. (Erdelyi, Susan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Remove V. Coker and M. Coker as Parties and Dismiss Only Koberlein Law Office and Robinson, Keenon, and Kendrow, P.A. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 6/10/2022. (JW)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Glennel Bowden, Tomi Brown, City Council of Lake City Florida, Columbia County Board of County Commissioners, Stephen Douglas, David Fina, Florida Secretary of State, Joel Foreman, Nathan Gambles, III, Vanessa George, Jake Hill, Eugene Jefferson, Justice and Equality Coalition, Incorporated, Fred Koberlein, Jr, Lake City, Columbia County Chamber of Commerce, Northeast Florida Newspaper, LLC, Kris Robinson, Christopher Todd Sampson, Audrey Sikes, Steve Smith, Slyvester Warren, III, Ronald Williams, Todd Wilson, Stephen Witt with Jury Demand. Terminating Koberlein Law Office and Robinson, Keenon, and Kendrow, PA filed by Befaithful Coker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(BGR)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Voluntarily Remove V. Coker and M. Coker as Parties and Dismiss only Koberlein Law Office and Robinson, Keenon, and Kendrow, PA by Befaithful Coker. (BGR)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants Terminating M. C. (Minor Child) and V. C. (Minor Child) filed by Befaithful Coker. Related document: #3 Amended Complaint, filed by M. C., V. C., Befaithful Coker, #1 Complaint, filed by M. C., V. C., Befaithful Coker.(AEP)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of service by Befaithful Coker re #3 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LDJ)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (RH)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER striking #3 Amended Complaint. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint consistent with the directives of this Order on or before June 2, 2022. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 5/16/2022. (MHM)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER IN from Orlando Division on 05/09/2022 Case Number 6:22-cv-854. Case assigned to District Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New Case Number: 3:22-cv-518-MMH-LLL. (LRB)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EMERGENCY AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by M. C., V. C., Befaithful Coker.(LDJ)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 This case is TRANSFERRED to the Jacksonville Division of this Court, which encompasses Columbia County. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/9/2022. (YG)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 EMERGENCY COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ORL103431) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Support Letters, #2 Exhibit B - Liaison Email, #3 Exhibit C - Self-Executing Order, #4 Exhibit D - Warren III Legal Advice, #5 Exhibit E - Lake City Reporter Article, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(LDJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coker et al v. Warren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Florida Newspaper, LLC
Represented By: Brooks C. Rathet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slyvester Warren, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice and Equality Coalition, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Council of Lake City Florida
Represented By: Susan S. Erdelyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Hill
Represented By: Susan S. Erdelyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Jefferson
Represented By: Susan S. Erdelyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Todd Sampson
Represented By: Susan S. Erdelyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Witt
Represented By: Susan S. Erdelyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Sikes
Represented By: Susan S. Erdelyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomi Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Koberlein, Jr.
Represented By: Susan S. Erdelyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koberlein Law Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson, Keenon, and Kendrow, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake City, Columbia County Chamber of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake City Reporter
Represented By: Brooks C. Rathet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Wilson
Represented By: Brooks C. Rathet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glennel Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Gambles, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Bradshaw Robinson
Represented By: Jennifer Catherine Biewend
Represented By: Kris Bradshaw Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Befaithful Coker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?