Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. Colony Tire Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Colony Tire Corporation and Magic Tilt Trailers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00144
Filed: February 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Colony Tire Corporation. (Morley, Bryan)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER denying as unnecessary #9 the plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time. The deadline for the parties to file the case management report is April 17, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/3/2023. (DS)
March 29, 2023 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Kyle Morley on behalf of Colony Tire Corporation (Morley, Bryan) Modified text on 3/29/2023 (BD).
March 23, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kevin Gray Mercer on behalf of Magic Tilt Trailers, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Kevin G. Mercer. (Mercer, Kevin)
March 23, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kevin Gray Mercer of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
March 22, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Magic Tilt Trailers, Inc.. (Mercer, Kevin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #7 Amended Complaint by Magic Tilt Trailers, Inc..(Mercer, Kevin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #7 Amended Complaint by Colony Tire Corporation.(Morley, Bryan)
March 22, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Gray Mercer on behalf of Magic Tilt Trailers, Inc. (Mercer, Kevin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America identifying Corporate Parent TRAVELERS COMPANIES INC for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.. (Reilly, Michael)
March 22, 2023 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to File Case Management Report by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Reilly, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified text on 3/23/2023 (BD).
March 8, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Kyle Morley on behalf of Colony Tire Corporation (Morley, Bryan)
March 7, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Reilly, Michael)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER directing counsel to review the Local Rules, including Local Rule 1.08, which requires certain typefaces and sizes to ensure readability and equal content within page limits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 2/13/2023. (DS)
February 9, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Colony Tire Corporation. (JDR)
February 9, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Magic Tilt Trailers, Inc.. (JDR)
February 9, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KKH)
February 8, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:23-cv-0144-TJC-PDB. (SJB)
February 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20489816) filed by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Colony Tire Corporation, #3 Proposed Summons Magic Tilt Trailers, Inc.)(Reilly, Michael) Modified on 2/8/2023 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. Colony Tire Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Michael J. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colony Tire Corporation
Represented By: Bryan Kyle Morley
Represented By: Tyler Alexander Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic Tilt Trailers, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Gray Mercer
Represented By: Caroline E. Kubovy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?