Rodriguez v. Valle Elite Remodeling Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Paolo Gabriel Rodriguez and Cesar Fabian Fernandez
Defendant: Valle Elite Remodeling Services LLC, Sandra L Blandon Moreno, Richard Valle, Valle Elite Remodeling Services, LLC and Sandra L. Blandon Moreno
Case Number: 3:2023cv00388
Filed: April 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint at Law (Doc. 11) is accepted as the operative complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 5/15/2023. (KMD)
May 12, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Paolo Gabriel Rodriguez, Cesar Fabian Fernandez. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schlade, Daniel) Modified text on 5/15/2023 (BD).
May 12, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File #11 Amended Complaint by Paolo Gabriel Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schlade, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified text on 5/15/2023 (BD).
May 4, 2023 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 4/20/23 by Paolo Gabriel Rodriguez as to Richard Valle. (Schlade, Daniel) Modified text on 5/5/2023 (BD).
May 4, 2023 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 4/20/23 by Paolo Gabriel Rodriguez as to Sandra L. Blandon Moreno. (Schlade, Daniel)
May 4, 2023 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 4/20/23 by Paolo Gabriel Rodriguez as to Valle Elite Remodeling Services, LLC. (Schlade, Daniel)
April 5, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Paolo Gabriel Rodriguez. (Schlade, Daniel)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 4/5/2023. (KKH)
April 5, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Sandra L. Blandon Moreno, Richard Valle, Valle Elite Remodeling Services, LLC. (BD)
April 5, 2023 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:23-cv-388-TGC-JBT. (ARC)
April 4, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Schlade on behalf of Paolo Gabriel Rodriguez (Schlade, Daniel)
April 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20688032) filed by Paolo Gabriel Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Local Rule 3.03)(Schlade, Daniel) Modified text on 4/5/2023 (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Valle Elite Remodeling Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paolo Gabriel Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel Schlade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Fabian Fernandez
Represented By: Daniel Schlade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valle Elite Remodeling Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra L Blandon Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valle Elite Remodeling Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra L. Blandon Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?