Doe v. Baker County et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Baker County, Baker County Corrections Management Corporation, Chair Sharon Padgett, Randy Crews, Evelyn Blue, JAMES MESSER, Peyton Prescott, Brian Louis Robinson, Cardell C. Smith, United States, Sharon Padgett, Scotty Rhoden, Assailant Does 1-X and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2023cv00609
Filed: May 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Laura Lothman Lambert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting doc. #23 Defendant Baker County's Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint with Supportive Memorandum of Law; defendant Baker County is directed to respond to plaintiff's complaint on or before July 28, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 7/12/2023. (KAS)
July 12, 2023 Filing 24 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff Jane Doe's Notice re 18 Order by Jane Doe (Hart, Barbara).
July 11, 2023 Filing 23 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply with Supportive Memorandum of Law by Baker County. (Erdelyi, Susan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
July 10, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by Baker County Corrections Management Corporation, Evelyn Blue, Randy Crews, James Messer, Sharon Padgett, Peyton Prescott, Scotty Rhoden. (Spellman, Michael)
July 3, 2023 Set/reset deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Responses due by 7/10/2023 (JK)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER; on or before July 10, 2023, defendants shall file a response indicating whether they object to doc. #3, Plaintiff Jane Doe's Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. If defendants do not file a response, the motion will be treated as unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 7/3/2023. (KAS)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due on or before July 21, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 6/30/2023. (NK)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Defendant Baker County's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint with Supportive Memorandum of Law. Defendant Baker County's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due on or before July 12, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 6/30/2023. (NK)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER: No later than July 12, 2023, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to file a notice under seal advising the Court of Plaintiff's full name. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 6/28/2023. (JW)
June 26, 2023 Filing 17 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Baker County Corrections Management Corporation. (Spellman, Michael)
June 26, 2023 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Baker County Corrections Management Corporation, Evelyn Blue, Randy Crews, James Messer, Sharon Padgett, Peyton Prescott, Scotty Rhoden. (Spellman, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
June 26, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael P. Spellman on behalf of Baker County Corrections Management Corporation, Evelyn Blue, Randy Crews, James Messer, Sharon Padgett, Peyton Prescott, Scotty Rhoden. Lead Counsel: Michael P. Spellman. (Spellman, Michael)
June 26, 2023 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Baker County. (Erdelyi, Susan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. (Modified on 6/26/2023, to edit text) (BGR).
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7, #8 and #9 Motion by Plaintiff Pursuant to Local Rule 2.02 for Special Admission of Attorneys Steve A. Medina, Samuel Mukiibi and Barbara J. Hart to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 6/12/2023. (NK)
June 7, 2023 Filing 12 SEPCIAL Admission Attorney Certification of Barbara J. Hart by Jane Doe re #9 Motion for Barbara Hart to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20917367 for $150 (MDC)
June 7, 2023 Filing 11 SPECIAL Admission Attorney Certification of Samuel Mukibi by Jane Doe re #8 Motion for Samuel Mukibi to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20917350 for $150 (MDC)
June 7, 2023 Filing 10 SPECIAL Admission Attorney Certification of Steven A. Medina by Jane Doe re #7 Motion for Steve Medina to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20917323 for $150 (MDC)
June 7, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Barbara Hart to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20917367 for $150 by Jane Doe. (Poindexter, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
June 7, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Samuel Mukibi to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20917350 for $150 by Jane Doe. (Poindexter, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
June 7, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Steve Medina to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20917323 for $150 by Jane Doe. (Poindexter, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
June 2, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Barbara J. Hart, Steven A. Medina and Samuel Mukiibi Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGR)
May 23, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Baker County, Baker County Corrections Management Corporation, Evelyn Blue, Randy Crews, James Messer, Sharon Padgett, Peyton Prescott, Scotty Rhoden, Brian Louis Robinson, Cardell C. Smith, United States of America. (BGR)
May 23, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW)
May 22, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jane Doe)(Poindexter, James) (Modified on 5/23/2023, to edit text) (BGR).
May 22, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:23-cv-609-MMH-LLL. (Gonzalez, Janet)
May 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20857948) filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons)(Poindexter, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Baker County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: James C. Poindexter
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Represented By: Samuel Mukiibi
Represented By: Steven A. Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker County
Represented By: Susan S. Erdelyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker County Corrections Management Corporation
Represented By: Michael P. Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chair Sharon Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Crews
Represented By: Michael P. Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Blue
Represented By: Michael P. Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MESSER
Represented By: Michael P. Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peyton Prescott
Represented By: Michael P. Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Louis Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardell C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Padgett
Represented By: Michael P. Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotty Rhoden
Represented By: Michael P. Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assailant Does 1-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?