Shelor v. Tata Motors Group et al
Plaintiff: Warren Shelor
Defendant: Tata Motors Group, Jaguar Land Rover Limited and Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00908
Filed: August 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Jaguar Land Rover Limited, Other Affiliate Tata Motors Ltd., Other Affiliate Jaguar Land Rover Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC, Other Affiliate TML Holdings Pte. Ltd. for Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC. (Wedekind, Lee)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER striking #13 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC. Proper disclosure statement due September 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/7/2023. (JW)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Jaguar Land Rover North America's unopposed motion for an extension of time. Jaguar Land Rover North America must respond to the complaint by December 4, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 9/6/2023. (DS)
September 5, 2023 Filing 13 STRICKEN PER ORDER SEE DOC. 15 - CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Jaguar Land Rover Limited, Other Affiliate Tata Motors Ltd., Other Affiliate Jaguar Land Rover Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC, Other Affiliate TML Holdings Pte. Ltd. for Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC. (Wedekind, Lee) Modified on 9/8/2023 (LAB).
September 5, 2023 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC. (Wedekind, Lee) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
September 5, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John McDermott on behalf of Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC (McDermott, John)
September 5, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Dilly Wedekind, III on behalf of Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC (Wedekind, Lee)
August 29, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Warren Shelor. (Douglas, Charles)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER directing counsel to review the Local Rules, including Local Rule 1.08, which requires certain typefaces and sizes to ensure readability and equal content within page limits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 8/28/2023. (DS)
August 28, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE by Warren Shelor Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT (Douglas, Charles) Modified on 8/29/2023 as to docket text(ARL).
August 22, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 08/14/2023 by Warren Shelor as to Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC. (Blocker, Jeremiah)
August 4, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW)
August 3, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Charles T Douglas, Jr.; Rory John Diamond; Jeremiah Ray Blocker of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
August 3, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Jaguar Land Rover Limited, Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC, Tata Motors Group. (JK)
August 3, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:23-cv-908-MMH-PDB. (AM)
August 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jaguar Land Rover Limited, Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC, Tata Motors Group with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21109194) filed by Warren Shelor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Blocker, Jeremiah) Modified text on 8/3/2023 (JK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelor v. Tata Motors Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Shelor
Represented By: Jeremiah Ray Blocker
Represented By: Charles T Douglas, Jr.
Represented By: Rory John Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tata Motors Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC
Represented By: Lee Dilly Wedekind, III
Represented By: John McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?