OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc. et al v. United Networks of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc. and OptumRx, Inc.
Defendant: United Networks of America and United Networks of America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01308
Filed: November 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 10 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER granting #27 Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Clarification and granting #24 Unopposed Motion to File a Single Consolidated Opposition and Cross-Motion Up to 45 Pages. Respondent may file its combined opposition and cross-motion on or before January 5, 2024, limited to 45 pages. At the January 10, 2024 telephone hearing, the Court will set the deadlines for further briefing, take up the motions to seal and unseal, and discuss overall case status. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/29/2023.(SRW)
December 28, 2023 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Clarification Concerning December 22, 2023 Order by United Networks of America, Inc.. (Dorough, Marisa)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #21 Luke O'Brien's and #22 Samuel Cornish's motions asking the Court for permission to specially appear to represent United Networks of America, Inc., in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 12/28/2023. (ASL)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Setting Telephone Hearing on motions to seal and unseal (Docs. #17, #18, #20) and to set a briefing schedule (no briefs are due in advance of the hearing). Telephone Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2024 at 2:00 PM before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. See order for call-in instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/22/2023. (SRW)
December 22, 2023 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Leave to file a Single, Consolidated Opposition and Cross-Motion Up to 45 Pages by United Networks of America, Inc. (Dorough, Marisa)
December 21, 2023 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule and to Extend Time as to Oppositions to Motions to Seal and Unseal; re#20 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Petition to Vacate Under Seal, #17 MOTION to Unseal Document Petition and Exhibits in Part by All Plaintiffs. (Baines, Erica) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Modified on 12/22/2023, to edit text) (BGR).
December 20, 2023 Filing 22 Amended Unopposed MOTION for Samuel Scott Cornish to appear pro hac vice Admission Fees Previously Paid in #14 Motion for Pro Hac by United Networks of America, Inc.. (Dorough, Marisa) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified text on 12/20/2023 (BD).
December 20, 2023 Filing 21 Amended Unopposed MOTION for Luke J. O'Brien to appear pro hac vice Admission Fees Previously Paid in #13 Motion for Pro Hac by United Networks of America, Inc.. (Dorough, Marisa) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified text on 12/20/2023 (BD).
December 15, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Petition to Vacate Under Seal by All Plaintiffs (Baines, Erica). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified text on 12/18/2023 (BD).
December 15, 2023 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Amended Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award) against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Baines, Erica) Modified text on 12/18/2023 (BD).
December 15, 2023 Filing 18 SEALED MOTION to Unseal Petition and Exhibits in Part re #10 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by United Networks of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dorough, Marisa). Modified text on 12/15/2023 (GL).
December 15, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Unseal Document Petition and Exhibits in Part by United Networks of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dorough, Marisa) Modified text on 12/15/2023 (GL).
December 14, 2023 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically To Set Briefing Schedule and to Extend Time as to Petitions Regarding Arbitration Award , Joint MOTION for More Definite Statement by United Networks of America, Inc.. (Dorough, Marisa) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice to filing motions that comply with Local Rule 2.01(c) #13, #14 Marisa Dorough's motions asking the Court for permission for Luke O'Brien and Samuel Cornish to specially appear to represent United Networks of America, Inc., in this action. The lawyers moving for special admission must be the movants. A sample motion for special admission is available on the Court's website at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/form/motion-special-admission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 12/12/2023. (ASL)
December 4, 2023 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Samuel Scott Cornish to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21525669 for $150 by United Networks of America, Inc. (Dorough, Marisa) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
December 4, 2023 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Luke J. O'Brien to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21525611 for $150 by United Networks of America, Inc. (Dorough, Marisa) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
December 4, 2023 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by United Networks of America, Inc. (Dorough, Marisa)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT (Unredacted Petition with Exhibits 1 through 11) re #10 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Baines, Erica). Modified to edit docket text on 12/4/2023 (RLK).
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 the Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Plaintiffs must file the proposed documents under seal by 12/4/2023. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 11/22/2023. (VNG)
November 15, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Samuel Scott Cornish and Luke J. O'Brien Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
November 15, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER of service returned executed on 11/15/2023 by United Networks of America, Inc. as to United Networks of America, Inc. (Dorough, Marisa) Modified on 11/15/2023 to edit docket text (AJS).
November 15, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Rosen Dorough on behalf of United Networks of America, Inc. (Dorough, Marisa)
November 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AMM)
November 6, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to United Networks of America, Inc. (CTR)
November 6, 2023 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:23-cv-1308-TJC-PDB. (RLK)
November 3, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Health Group, Inc. for OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. (Baines, Erica) Modified on 11/6/2023 (CTR).
November 3, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to file DOCUMENT (Petition to Partially Vacate Arbitration Award and Exhibits) under seal by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Leanne Matchen)(Baines, Erica). Modified on 11/6/2023 (CTR).
November 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Petition to Partially Vacate Arbitration Award) against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21428142) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Holecek, #3 Exhibit 01 -2023.10.05 - Final Award, #4 Exhibit 02 - 2013.11.01 - Discount Card Agreement UNA-Catamaran, #5 Exhibit 03 - 2016.05.25 - UNA Claim No. 3465 Arbitration Statement, #6 Exhibit 04 - 2005.09.12 - HT-UNA Discount Card Agreement, #7 Exhibit 05 - 2021.04.26 - UNA - Claimant's Supplemental Arbitration Statement, #8 Exhibit 06 - 2023.07.26 - UNA's Post-Trial Brief dated July 26, 2023, #9 Exhibit 07 - 2023.07.26 - Catamaran's Post-Hearing Brief, #10 Exhibit. 08 - 2017.07.19 - UNA - Claimant's Motion for Interim Relief, #11 Exhibit 09 - 2023.06.05 - UNA's Pretrial Brief, #12 Exhibit 10 - Arbitration Protective Order, #13 Exhibit 11 - Merits Hearing Transcripts Vol. 1 through 6, #14 Exhibit Summons)(Baines, Erica) Modified on 11/6/2023 (CTR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc. et al v. United Networks of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OptumRx PBM of Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Erica Conklin Baines
Represented By: Michael Holecek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OptumRx, Inc.
Represented By: Erica Conklin Baines
Represented By: Michael Holecek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Networks of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Networks of America, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Scott Cornish
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Luke J. O'Brien
Represented By: Marisa Rosen Dorough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?