United States of America v. Ottey et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Deron Ottey, Christine Wilson-Ottey, Regions Bank, County Tax Collector Diane Hutchings, Pace Island Owners Assoc., Inc., Regions Bank doing business as Regions Mortgage and Diane Hutchings
Case Number: 3:2023cv01367
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
2 Judge: Laura Lothman Lambert
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6502 IRS:Enforcement of tax liens
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Deron Ottey, Christine Wilson-Ottey by United States of America. (Hollman, Meredith) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
January 10, 2024 Filing 20 WAIVER of service returned executed on 01/10/2024 by United States of America as to Pace Island Owners Assoc., Inc.. (Hollman, Meredith)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon review of #16 Joint Stipulation of Priority and Request to Excuse Certain Defendants from Full Participation in this Action, Defendants Regions Bank and Diane Hutchings, Clay County Tax Collector, are excused from participation in this action unless and until the Property (as further described at paragraphs 3 and 4 of the Stipulation), is ordered sold, at which time they shall provide proof of the amounts due under their respective liens and claims. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 1/2/2024. (JW)
December 21, 2023 Filing 18 Case Reassigned to Judge Marcia Morales Howard. New case number: 3:23-cv-1367-MMH-LLL. Judge Timothy J. Corrigan no longer assigned to the case. (jkl)
December 20, 2023 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of service by United States of America re #16 Stipulation of Priority. (Hollman, Meredith)
December 19, 2023 Filing 16 JOINT Stipulation of Priority and Request to Excuse Certain Defendants from Full Participation in this Action by United States of America. (Hollman, Meredith) (Modified on 12/20/2023, to edit text) (BGR).
December 19, 2023 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 12/09/2023 by United States of America as to Christine Wilson-Ottey. (Hollman, Meredith)
December 19, 2023 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 12/09/2023 by United States of America as to Deron Ottey. (Hollman, Meredith)
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 11/30/2023 by United States of America as to Regions Bank. (Hollman, Meredith)
December 15, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on 12/11/2023 by United States of America as to Diane Hutchings. (Hollman, Meredith)
December 14, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS reissued as to Pace Island Owners Assoc., Inc. (SPM)
December 14, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of new summons due to new registered agent by United States of America re #8 Proposed summons (Hollman, Meredith) Modified on 12/14/2023 (SPM).
December 13, 2023 Filing 9 Amended NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Hollman, Meredith) Modified on 12/14/2023 (SPM).
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by United States of America. (Hollman, Meredith)
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 12/09/2023 by United States of America as to Christine Wilson-Ottey. (Hollman, Meredith)
December 12, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 12/09/2023 by United States of America as to Deron Ottey. (Hollman, Meredith)
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Hollman, Meredith)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AMM)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Diane Hutchings, Deron Ottey, Pace Island Owners Assoc., Inc., Regions Bank, Christine Wilson-Ottey. (ABC)
November 20, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:23-cv-1367-TJC-LLL. (ARC)
November 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons for Deron Ottey, #3 Proposed Summons Summons for Christine Wilson-Ottey, #4 Proposed Summons Summons for Regions Bank, #5 Proposed Summons Summons for Diane Hutchings, #6 Proposed Summons Summons for Pace Island HOA)(Hollman, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ottey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Meredith Elliott Hollman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deron Ottey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Wilson-Ottey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Tax Collector Diane Hutchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pace Island Owners Assoc., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank doing business as Regions Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Hutchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?