Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant: Rheya A. Jackson, Unknown Spouse of Rheya A. Jackson, Rheya Jackson, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Unknown Spouse of Rheya Jackson, Unknown Tenant #1 and Unknown Tenant #2
Case Number: 3:2023cv01404
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Monte C Richardson
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Strike #9 Answer to Counterclaim and Motion for Leave to File Amended Affirmative Defenses filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Affirmative Defenses)(Anderson, Terrance) Modified to correct event type on 1/22/2024 (TPL).
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER referring case to mediation and directing selection of a mediator within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Mediation shall be conducted on or before May 30, 2025. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 1/12/2024. (TPL)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/28/2025 Dispositive motions due by 3/28/2025 Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2025 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger Bench Trial set for trial term 9/8/2025 at 9:30 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 1/11/2024. (TPL)
January 8, 2024 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Nationstar Mortgage LLC.. (Anderson, Terrance)
January 8, 2024 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Anderson, Terrance)
January 5, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Answer to Counterclaim Three Business Days Late or Deem Answer Filed December 26, 2023 Timely Filed filed by Rheya A. Jackson. (ELM)
January 5, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Affirmative Defenses regarding #9 Answer to Counterclaim by Rheya A. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ELM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 26, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Answer to Counterclaim Three Business Days Late or Deem Answer Filed December 26, 2023 Timely Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Anderson, Terrance) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 26, 2023 Filing 9 REPLY to #3 Counterclaim by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Related document: #3 Answer to Complaint Counterclaim filed by Rheya A. Jackson.(Anderson, Terrance) Modified on 12/27/2023 as to docket text(ARL).
December 26, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance Wayne Anderson, Jr on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Anderson, Terrance)
December 22, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED MOTION for Entry of Default to Correct the Title to Request for Entry of Default by Rheya A. Jackson. (BGR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 21, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default against Nationstar Mortgage LLC by Rheya A. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(BGR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 by Rheya A. Jackson. (BGR)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIM against Nationstar Mortgage LLC by Rheya A. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O)(BGR)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Rheya A. Jackson, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Unknown Spouse of Rheya A. Jackson, Unknown Tenant #1, Unknown Tenant #2 filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Originally filed in State Court on 11/3/2023)(BGR)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 4th Judicial Circuit, Duval County, FL, case number 16-2023-CA-011213-XXXX-MA filed in State Court on 11/3/2023. Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 36908 filed by Rheya A. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BGR) Modified text on 12/1/2023 (GL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheya A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse of Rheya A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheya Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse of Rheya Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Andrew Arias
Represented By: Terrance Wayne Anderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?