Parker v. Clearpath Lending et al
Plaintiff: Natosha L. Parker
Defendant: Clearpath Lending, US Bank, NA, M&T Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration System and Does 1 Through 100 Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2023cv01437
Filed: December 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2024 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 1/4/2024 by Natosha L. Parker as to US Bank, NA. (ELM)
February 8, 2024 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 1/22/2024 by Natosha L. Parker as to Mortgage Electronic Registration System. (ELM)
February 8, 2024 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 1/3/2024 by Natosha L. Parker as to Clearpath Lending. (ELM)
February 8, 2024 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 12/27/2023 by Natosha L. Parker as to M&T Bank. (ELM)
February 8, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Natosha L. Parker. (ELM)
February 8, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clearpath Lending, Does 1 Through 100 Inclusive, M&T Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, US Bank, NA filed by Natosha L. Parker. (Exhibits not provided.) Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Natosha L. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List)(ELM)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE no later than 2/8/2024 as to why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 1/19/2024. (SRW)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER advising pro se Plaintiff of some procedural rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/19/2023. (ADM)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying request for temporary restraining order; directing plaintiff to file amended complaint no later than 1/10/2024. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/18/2023. (SRW)
December 18, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Clearpath Lending, M&T Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, US Bank, NA. (BD)
December 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fee $405.00, receipt number 36948. Filed by Natosha L. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chambers Notified) (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Clearpath Lending et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natosha L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearpath Lending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?