Darby v. Teksystems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mellenay Darby
Defendant: TekSystems, Inc.
Other: Rodney Max
Case Number: 3:2023cv01502
Filed: December 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Laura Lothman Lambert
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Filing 20 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (BGR)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Fact Discovery due by 9/3/2024. Expert discovery due by 2/14/2025. Dispositive motions due by 3/28/2025. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/30/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2025 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 9/2/2025 at 09:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 1/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Court Docket)(JW)
January 19, 2024 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Appelbaum, Steven)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting doc. #15 and doc. 16, defendant's Unopposed Motions for Special Admission. Alexander Reich and Mark Nehme are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant TekSystems, Inc.; counsel shall register with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system if they have not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 1/5/2024. (NMK)
January 4, 2024 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Mark Nehme to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21621816 for $150 by TekSystems, Inc. (Appelbaum, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. Modified text on 1/4/2024 (GL).
January 4, 2024 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Alexander Reich to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21621777 for $150 by TekSystems, Inc. (Appelbaum, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. Modified text on 1/4/2024 (GL).
January 3, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Mellenay Darby. (Wenzel, Steven)
January 3, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Mellenay Darby. Related case(s): Yes (Wenzel, Steven)
December 29, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #6 Complaint by TekSystems, Inc.(Appelbaum, Steven) Modified on 1/2/2024 to edit docket text (EAM).
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Steven Greg Wenzel on behalf of Mellenay Darby. Lead Counsel: Steven G. Wenzel. (Wenzel, Steven)
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW)
December 26, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Steven Myer Appelbaum on behalf of TekSystems, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Steven M. Appelbaum. (Appelbaum, Steven)
December 22, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Steven Myer Appelbaum of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
December 22, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
December 22, 2023 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against TekSystems, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Mellenay Darby. Filed in State Court 11/29/2023.(CTR)
December 22, 2023 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:23-cv-1502-MMH-LLL. (RLK)
December 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of compliance with Local Rule 1.06 by TekSystems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Other Documents)(Appelbaum, Steven) Modified on 12/22/2023 (CTR).
December 22, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by TekSystems, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Allegis Group, Inc., Other Affiliate TekSystems Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Allegis Group Holdings, Inc. for TekSystems, Inc. (Appelbaum, Steven) Modified on 12/22/2023 (CTR).
December 22, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by TekSystems, Inc. Related case(s): No (Appelbaum, Steven) Modified on 12/22/2023 (CTR).
December 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court 4th Judicial Circuit Duval County, case number 16-2023-CA-011517 filed in State Court on November 29, 2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21592994 filed by TekSystems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Sheet State Court Docket, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Appelbaum, Steven) Modified on 12/22/2023 (CTR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darby v. Teksystems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mellenay Darby
Represented By: Steven Greg Wenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TekSystems, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Myer Appelbaum
Represented By: Alexander Lee Reich
Represented By: Mark Nehme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Rodney Max
Represented By: Rodney A. Max
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?