Freeman v. Wipro Limited Corp
Plaintiff: David Freeman
Defendant: Wipro Limited Corp
Case Number: 3:2024cv00009
Filed: January 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Wendy W Berger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2024 Filing 29 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Wipro Limited Corp.(Storch, Natalie)
February 21, 2024 Filing 28 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #23 Case Management Scheduling Order by David Freeman. (Kroboth, Andres)
February 20, 2024 Filing 27 **INCORRECT EVENT, COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE** NOTICE by David Freeman re #23 Case Management Scheduling Order of Filing Answers to Court Interrogatories (Kroboth, Andres) Modified text on 2/21/2024 (GL).
February 7, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kaleigh Hartigan Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELM)
February 6, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Wipro Limited Corp. Related case(s): No (Storch, Natalie)
February 6, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Natalie J. Storch on behalf of Wipro Limited Corp. Lead Counsel: Natalie J. Storch. (Storch, Natalie)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 2/6/2024. (DS)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Matthew Hank's and #21 Kaleigh McManus's motions asking the Court for permission to specially appear to represent Wipro Limited Corp., in this action. By February 16, 2024, counsel must notify the Court who will be serving as lead counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on February 2, 2024. (AMH)
January 30, 2024 Filing 21 Amended MOTION for Kaleigh McManus (f/k/a Kaleigh Hartigan) to appear pro hac vice Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21666289 - 1/17/24 by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
January 30, 2024 Filing 20 Second AMENDED MOTION for Matthew Hank to appear pro hac vice by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified on 1/31/2024 (CTR).
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.01(c) #12 Kaleigh Hartigan's and #17 Matthew Hank's motions asking the Court for permission to specially appear to represent the defendant in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 1/19/2024. (ASL)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 the defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time. The defendant must respond to the complaint by February 28, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on January 22, 2024. (AMH)
January 18, 2024 Filing 17 Amended MOTION for Matthew Hank to appear pro hac vice Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21666216 for $150 by Wipro Limited Corp by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
January 18, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Matthew Hank, Kaleigh Hartigan Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JS)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/17/2024. (CKS)
January 17, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wipro Limited Corp identifying Corporate Parent Wipro Limited for Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie)
January 17, 2024 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
January 17, 2024 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Kaleigh Hartigan to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21666289 for $150 by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
January 17, 2024 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew Hank to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21666216 for $150 by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified on 1/19/2024 amended motion filed. Motion terminated (ASL).
January 17, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie J. Storch on behalf of Wipro Limited Corp (Storch, Natalie)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/10/2024. (CKS)
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 01/08/2024 by David Freeman as to Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Noah)
January 5, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Wipro Limited Corp. (LNR)
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andres Kroboth on behalf of David Freeman (Kroboth, Andres)
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Andres Kroboth on behalf of David Freeman. Lead Counsel: Andres Kroboth. (Kroboth, Andres)
January 4, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by David Freeman. Related case(s): No (Storch, Noah)
January 4, 2024 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by David Freeman. (Storch, Noah)
January 4, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:24-cv-9-WWB-PDB. (JCG)
January 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wipro Limited Corp. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21620067) filed by David Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Storch, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Wipro Limited Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Freeman
Represented By: Noah E. Storch
Represented By: Andres Kroboth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wipro Limited Corp
Represented By: Natalie J. Storch
Represented By: Matthew J. Hank
Represented By: Kaleigh Hartigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?