U.S. Bank National Association v. Hampton et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Kristen Sheree Hampton, Rodney Adam Hampton, Lake 34758, LLC, Pritchard Point Property Owners Association, Inc., Florida Housing Finance Corporation, Sotterley Holdings 32220, LLC as Trustee for 2212 Sotterley Lane Land Trust, Pritchard Planation Homeowners Association, Inc., Unknown Trustee of the 2212 Sotterley Lane Land Trust, Unknown Beneficiaries of the 2212 Sotterley Lane Land Trust and Shoreline Hoas, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00031
Filed: January 9, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 191 Bank Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2024 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Sloat-Rogers, Vanessa)
February 12, 2024 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sloat-Rogers, Vanessa)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Plaintiff shall have up to and including February 26, 2024 to file a reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #12, which shall not exceed five pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 2/12/2024. (TSP)
February 6, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically For Leave to File Reply to Response [DE 12] by U.S. Bank National Association. (Sloat-Rogers, Vanessa)
February 5, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sotterley Holdings 32220, LLC as Trustee for 2212 Sotterley Lane Land Trust. (Morgan, Eric)
January 25, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Deed)(Sloat-Rogers, Vanessa)
January 23, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa D. Sloat-Rogers on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Sloat-Rogers, Vanessa)
January 11, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Christopher McGuire and Gregory Bryl of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
January 11, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Rosanne P. Perrine of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
January 11, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
January 11, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #5 Amended Complaint, by Shoreline Hoas, LLC. Filed in State Court 2/5/2020.(CTR)
January 11, 2024 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Florida Housing Finance Corporation, Kristen Sheree Hampton, Rodney Adam Hampton, Pritchard Point Property Owners Association, Inc., Shoreline Hoas, LLC, Unknown Beneficiaries of the 2212 Sotterley Lane Land Trust, Unknown Trustee of the 2212 Sotterley Lane Land Trust filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Filed in State Court 8/27/2019.(CTR)
January 11, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL)
January 10, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Wendy C. Manswell of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AET)
January 10, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:23-cv-31-HES-JBT. (AET)
January 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval Circuit Court, case number 2018-CA-006291 filed in State Court on 09-13-2018. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21640512 filed by Sotterley Holdings 32220, LLC as Trustee for 2212 Sotterley Lane Land Trust. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 State Court Other Documents, #6 State Court Other Documents, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morgan, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Hampton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Wendy C. Manswell
Represented By: Vanessa D. Sloat-Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Sheree Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Adam Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake 34758, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pritchard Point Property Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Rosanne P. Perrine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Housing Finance Corporation
Represented By: Christopher McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sotterley Holdings 32220, LLC as Trustee for 2212 Sotterley Lane Land Trust
Represented By: Eric A. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pritchard Planation Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Rosanne P. Perrine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Trustee of the 2212 Sotterley Lane Land Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Beneficiaries of the 2212 Sotterley Lane Land Trust
Represented By: Gregory Bryl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoreline Hoas, LLC
Represented By: Alisa D. Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?