TD Bank, N.A. v. Flagler 100 and 200 Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TD Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Flagler 100 and 200 Associates, LLC, Flagler 300 Associates, LLC, Flagler 400 Associates, LLC, Lakeside I and II Associates, LLC, Lakeside IV and V Associates, LLC and FREP II Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00036
Filed: January 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice pursuant to #12 the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. #1 The Notice of Lis Pendens is discharged. The Clerk should terminate all pending motions and deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 2/2/2024. (VNG)
January 30, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Release and Discharge of Notice of Lis Pendens by TD Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Lis Pendens (Brennan, John) (Modified on 1/30/2024, to edit text) (BGR).
January 30, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by TD Bank, N.A. (Brennan, John)
January 23, 2024 Filing 11 RETURN of Service Executed on on 1/22/2024 as to FREP II Holdings, LLC by TD Bank, N.A. re #5 Summons issued (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service (FREP II Holdings))(Brennan, John) Modified text on 1/24/2024 (BD).
January 23, 2024 Filing 10 RETURN of Service Executed on on 1/22/2024 as to Lakeside IV and V Associates, LLC by TD Bank, N.A. re #5 Summons issued (Attachments: #1 Return of Service (Lakeside IV and V Associates))(Brennan, John) Modified text on 1/24/2024 (BD).
January 23, 2024 Filing 9 RETURN of Service Executed on on 1/22/2024 as to Lakeside I and II Associates, LLC by TD Bank, N.A. re #5 Summons issued (Attachments: #1 Return of Service (Lakeside I and II Associates))(Brennan, John) Modified text on 1/24/2024 (BD).
January 23, 2024 Filing 8 RETURN of Service Executed on 1/22/2024 as to Flagler 400 Associates, LLC by TD Bank, N.A. re #5 Summons issued (Attachments: #1 Return of Service (Flagler 400))(Brennan, John) Modified text on 1/24/2024 (BD).
January 23, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN of Service Executed on 1/22/2024 as to Flagler 300 Associates, LLC by TD Bank, N.A. re #5 Summons issued (Attachments: #1 Return of Service (Flagler 300))(Brennan, John) Modified text on 1/24/2024 (BD).
January 23, 2024 Filing 6 RETURN of Service Executed on 1/22/2024 as to Flagler 100 and 200 Associates, LLC by TD Bank, N.A. re #5 Summons issued (Attachments: #1 Return of Service (Flagler 100 and 200))(Brennan, John) Modified text on 1/24/2024 (BD).
January 17, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (ARL)
January 16, 2024 FEES Paid by TD Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $405.00, Receipt Number 36993). (ELM)
January 12, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AMM)
January 11, 2024 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:24-cv-36-TJC-JBT. (AA)
January 11, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Damages and Mortgage Foreclosure against All Defendants filed by TD Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Proposed Summons Flagler 100 and 200 Associates, #21 Proposed Summons Flagler 300 Associates, LLC, #22 Proposed Summons Flagler 400 Associates, LLC, #23 Proposed Summons Lakeside I and II Associates, LLC, #24 Proposed Summons Lakeside IV and V Associates, LLC, #25 Proposed Summons FREP II Holdings, LLC)(Brennan, John) Summonses not issued. Filing fee wasn't paid- Modified on 1/12/2024 (AJS).
January 11, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of lis pendens by TD Bank, N.A. (Brennan, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TD Bank, N.A. v. Flagler 100 and 200 Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John Michael Brennan
Represented By: John Michael Brennan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagler 100 and 200 Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagler 300 Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagler 400 Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeside I and II Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeside IV and V Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREP II Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?