US Bank National Association v. Powers et al
Plaintiff: US Bank National Association and U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Hunters Trace Homeowners Association 2, LLC, Adela Powers, Florida Housing Finance Corporation, a Public Corporation, Unknown Party #1 N/K/A AJ, Hunters Trace Homeowners Association, Inc., Florida Housing Finance Corporation and Unknown Party #1
Case Number: 3:2024cv00048
Filed: January 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Henry Lee Adams
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 191 Bank Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hunters Trace Homeowners Association, Inc. (Morgan, Eric) Modified on 3/11/2024 to edit docket text (EAM).
February 22, 2024 Filing 14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LP Recorded, #2 Exhibit CT Recorded, #3 Exhibit Order Deny Intervene, #4 Exhibit NOH MSJ)(Reznik, Philip)
February 22, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Lead Counsel and Appearance by Philip Reznik on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Reznik, Philip)
February 9, 2024 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hunters Trace Homeowners Association, Inc. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Morgan, Eric) Modified text on 2/14/2024 (MCB).
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing Defendant to file an Amended Notice of Removal on or before 2/9/2024. Signed by Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 1/31/2024. (MO)
January 23, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MO)
January 16, 2024 Filing 9 REPLY to #8 Answer and Affirmative Defenses by US Bank National Association. (Originally filed in State Court on 4/28/2023) (BD)
January 16, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #6 Complaint by Hunters Trace Homeowners Association, Inc. (Originally filed in State Court on 4/21/2023)(BD)
January 16, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Florida Housing Finance Corporation. (Originally filed in State Court on 4/18/2023) (BD)
January 16, 2024 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by US Bank National Association. (Originally filed in State Court on 3/30/2023) (BD)
January 16, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
January 16, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Ethan Setzer Katz of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
January 16, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSELS Joshua Pasqualone and Sean M. Murrell of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
January 16, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:24-cv-48-HLA-JBT. (JCG)
January 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clay Circuit Court, case number 2023 CA 000934 filed in State Court on 03/30/2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21655840 filed by Hunters Trace Homeowners Association 2, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 State Court Other Documents, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morgan, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Bank National Association v. Powers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Philip Reznik
Represented By: Joshua Pasqualone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunters Trace Homeowners Association 2, LLC
Represented By: Eric A. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adela Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Housing Finance Corporation, a Public Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #1 N/K/A AJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunters Trace Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Sean M. Murrell
Represented By: Eric A. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Housing Finance Corporation
Represented By: Ethan Setzer Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #1
Represented By: Eric A. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?