Stevens v. Sarnowski
Plaintiff: Kathleen Stevens
Defendant: Jason Sarnowski and Jason A. Sarnowski
Case Number: 3:2024cv00414
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Laura Lothman Lambert
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER dismissing case with prejudice pursuant to #12 the Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. The Clerk should close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 6/12/2024. (JCD)
June 11, 2024 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jason A. Sarnowski. (Armstrong, Victoria)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER advising the parties that they may dismiss the case only by a stipulation. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 6/10/2024. (VNG)
June 4, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Kathleen Stevens (Brady, Nicholas)
June 4, 2024 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Selection of mediator due by 7/1/2024; Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2024; Joinder of Parties due by 8/9/2024 ; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/3/2025; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/3/2025; Discovery due by 5/2/2025; Dispositive motions due by 6/3/2025; Pretrial statement due by 10/16/2025; All other motions due by 10/16/2025; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2025 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 11/3/2025 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/4/2024. (TPL)
May 9, 2024 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Armstrong, Victoria)
April 29, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL)
April 29, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Nicholas Brady, Ronald Steven Rawls of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ABM)
April 29, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jason A. Sarnowski. Filed in state court on 4/24/2024.(ABM)
April 29, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Jason A. Sarnowski with Jury Demand filed by Kathleen Stevens. Filed in state court on 3/29/2024.(ABM)
April 26, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Ronald Rawls of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:24-cv-414-TJC-LLL. (ARL)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial Circuit, in and for Hamilton County, FLORIDA, case number 2024-CA-020 filed in State Court on 3/29/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22029775 filed by Jason Sarnowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff Demand, #4 Exhibit D - Accident Report, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff Public Record, #6 Exhibit F - Defendant Public Record, #7 State Court COMPLAINT, #8 State Court ANSWER, #9 State Court Docket Sheet, #10 State Court Other Documents (Armstrong, Victoria) Modified text on 4/29/2024 (ABM). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2024: #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (ABM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Sarnowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Stevens
Represented By: Nicholas Brady
Represented By: Ronald Steven Rawls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Sarnowski
Represented By: Victoria Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason A. Sarnowski
Represented By: Victoria Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?