Riches v. Snipes Featured Case
Plaintiff: Jonathan Lee Riches
Defendant: Wesley Snipes
Case Number: 5:2007cv00376
Filed: September 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ocala Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Wm. Terrell Hodges
Presiding Judge: Gary R. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2007 Filing 4
JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice this case. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (AIQ)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3
ORDER dismissing case as frivolous pursuant to 28 USC 1915A. Signed by Judge Wm. Terrell Hodges on 9/21/2007. (JMJ)
September 20, 2007 Filing 2
NOTICE of Designation under Local Rule 3.05-Track One. (MAM)
September 17, 2007 Filing 1
Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Wesley Snipes titled "Complaint "kidnapped by Wesley Snipes tax money" TRO Temporary Restraining Order" filed by Jonathan Lee Riches. (no service copies provided, no filing fee paid)(AIQ) Modified on 9/19/2007 (LMF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riches v. Snipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Lee Riches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Snipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?