United States of America et al v. Institute of Cardiovascular Excellence, PLLC et al

Plaintiff: United States of America and Robert A. Green
Defendant: Institute of Cardiovascular Excellence, PLLC, Ice Holdings, PLLC, Asad Ullah Qamar and Humera A. Qamar
Consol_plaintiff: State of Florida and Holly Taylor
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America, State of Florida, Robert A. Green and Holly Taylor
Intervenor_defendant: Asad Qamar and Institute of Cardiovascular Excellence, PLLC
Case Number: 5:2011cv00406
Filed: July 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ocala Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Smith
Presiding Judge: Roy B. Dalton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 95 Motion for Reconsideration. Upon reconsideration, the Court affirms the conclusion in its April 26, 2016 Order (Doc. 94). As such, the Instant Action shall proceed through the entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/16/2016. (VMF)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER -- the Court declines to stay the Instant Action; the Instant Action will proceed as set forth in the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. 65). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/26/2016. (VMF)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to extend time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/11/2015. (Smith, Thomas)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 46 Motion for Reconsideration. See order for details. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/15/2015. (Dalton, Jr., Roy)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/2/2015. (VMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Institute of Cardiovascular Excellence, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel Robert Anderson
Represented By: Sean Flynn
Represented By: Michael D. Granston
Represented By: Eva U. Gunasekera
Represented By: Adam Russell Tarosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Green
Represented By: Jonathan Kroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Institute of Cardiovascular Excellence, PLLC
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ice Holdings, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asad Ullah Qamar
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humera A. Qamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: State of Florida
Represented By: Jill Bennett
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Von Hoene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Holly Taylor
Represented By: John S. Didday
Represented By: Rafael Jacinto Nobo, III
Represented By: Ben O'Neil
Represented By: Sam S. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel Robert Anderson
Represented By: Sean Flynn
Represented By: Michael D. Granston
Represented By: Eva U. Gunasekera
Represented By: Adam Russell Tarosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: State of Florida
Represented By: Jill Bennett
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Von Hoene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Robert A. Green
Represented By: Jonathan Kroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Holly Taylor
Represented By: John S. Didday
Represented By: Rafael Jacinto Nobo, III
Represented By: Ben O'Neil
Represented By: Sam S. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Asad Qamar
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Institute of Cardiovascular Excellence, PLLC
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?