Pike v. Trinity Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles W. Pike
Defendant: Trinity Industries, Inc. and Trinity Highway Products
Case Number: 5:2012cv00146
Filed: March 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ocala Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Smith
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge TJC
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting 135 Motion for summary judgment, directing that judgment be entered in favor of defendants on failure to warn claims (Counts VII, VIII, IX, X), dismissing with prejudice design defect claims (Counts I, II, III, IV, V, VI); finding as moot remaining motions 132 , 133 , 134 , 136 ; following entry of judgment, the Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 7/16/2014.(SRW)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER denying (Doc. 122) Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's Supplemental Disclosures (Docs. 117 and 119) shall be STRICKEN from the Court's Docket in accordance with Local Rule 3.03. Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Disclosures (Doc. 122) is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 10/10/2013. (JWM)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Granting (Doc. 115) MOTION to Overrule Defendant's Objections to Expert Discovery Depositions filed by Charles W. Pike, and Granting (Doc. 114) MOTION to Compel Response to Request to Produce filed by Charles W. Pike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/20/2013. (JWM)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Substitute Economist Dr. Borg for Dr. Pettingill (Doc. 113). Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/7/2013. (JWM)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying 77 Plaintiff's Motion to Overrule Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Request for Production; granting 82 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Expert Discovery Deadline. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/11/2013. (JLS)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER correcting scrivener's errors in Order 28 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/8/2012. (Smith, Thomas)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 16 Motion to quash subpoenas to non-parties. Court sua sponte quashes the subpoenas pursuant to Rule 45(a)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/7/2012. (Smith, Thomas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pike v. Trinity Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Pike
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Francis Edmund Pierce, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Highway Products
Represented By: Francis Edmund Pierce, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?