PNC Bank, National Association v. Scroggie et al
Plaintiff: |
PNC Bank, National Association |
Defendant: |
Joshua W. Scroggie, Michael T. Owen and J. Steve Rudnianyn |
Case Number: |
5:2015cv00162 |
Filed: |
March 31, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Ocala Office |
County: |
Marion |
Presiding Judge: |
Philip R. Lammens |
Presiding Judge: |
James S. Moody |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 1, 2016 |
Filing
30
WRIT OF POSSESSION AND ORDER ON MOTION TO CONFIRM FORECLOSURE SALE: Assignee Land Holding, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Confirm Foreclosure Sale 29 is GRANTED. The foreclosure sale conducted on April 12, 2016, in this action is CONFIRMED. T he court-appointed Special Master, Philip J. von Kahle, is directed to convey the Property, as defined in the Final Judgment of Foreclosure (Doc. 20) and the Motion (Doc. 29), to Land Holding, LLC, by a Certificate of Title in the form attached to th e Motion as Exhibit 1, which shall be filed and recorded in the Official Records of Marion County, Florida, with the same legal effect as a Certificate of Title pursuant to Section 45.011, Fla. Stat., et seq. Land Holding, LLC, its successors and as signs, shall be let into exclusive possession of the Property. This Order constitutes a writ of possession enforceable by the United States Marshal and/or state law enforcement officers, if necessary. Jurisdiction is reserved for one year to enter such orders as are necessary and proper, including a judgment of re-foreclosure. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/1/2016. (LN)
|
February 23, 2016 |
Filing
21
ORDER Appointing Master to Conduct Foreclosure Sale. The Court appoints Philip J. von Kahle as a Master (the "Special Master") pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 53 to conduct the foreclosure sale of the property in accordanc e with the procedures sent forth in the Final Judgment of Foreclosure entered in this case. (Doc. 20). Plaintiff shall pay the Special Master a flat fee of $2,500.00 for his services. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/23/2016. (LN)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?