Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC v. 3.921 Acres of Land in Lake County Florida et al
Plaintiff: Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC
Defendant: 3.921 Acres of Land in Lake County Florida, Sunderman Groves, Inc and Unknown Owners, If Any
Case Number: 5:2016cv00178
Filed: March 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ocala Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Philip R. Lammens
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0717
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Dkt. 224) of the Magistrate Judge is adopted, confirmed, and approved in all respects and is made a part of this Order for all purposes, including appellate review. Defendant, Sunderman Groves Inc.'s Motion to Tax Prejudgment and Post Judgment Interest (Dkt. 211) is granted in part and denied in part. Sunderman Groves is awarded a total of $13,071.60 in prejudgment interest. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Sunderman Groves, Inc. and against Plaintiff Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC in the amount of $13,071.60 in prejudgment interest. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/10/2022. (SMB)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER denying 202 Defendant's renewed motion to compel discovery related to its request for attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/11/2021. (SA)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 15 Defendant Sunderman Grove Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b) for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/12/2016. (LN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC v. 3.921 Acres of Land in Lake County Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Kurtis T. Bauerle
Represented By: Bruce M. Harris
Represented By: Gordon H. Harris
Represented By: Edgar Lopez
Represented By: Felecia G. Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.921 Acres of Land in Lake County Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunderman Groves, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners, If Any
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?