Skybolt Aeromotive Corporation v. Milspec Products, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Skybolt Aeromotive Corporation
Defendant: Milspec Products, Inc. and Jeremy Summers
Case Number: 5:2016cv00616
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ocala Office
County: Lake
Referring Judge: Philip R. Lammens
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring this case to the Federal Aviation Administration. See the Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/9/2017. (CAB)
June 7, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 60 Skybolt Aeromotive Corporation's request for attorney's fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/7/2017. (CAB)
April 21, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER terminating as moot 31 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel production of documents. On or before May 8, 2017, Plaintiff is directed to provide an assessment of its reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, necessitated by Defenda nt Milspec Products Inc.'s inadequate discovery responses. Milspec shall then have until on or before May 15, 2017, to show cause why costs and fees should not be awarded to Plaintiff in the amount stated, failing which the requested costs and fees may be imposed as requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/21/2017. (CAB)
April 14, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER confirming the briefing schedule determined during today's hearing. See the order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/14/2017. (CAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skybolt Aeromotive Corporation v. Milspec Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skybolt Aeromotive Corporation
Represented By: Jackson O. Brownlee
Represented By: Amber N. Davis
Represented By: Kevin W. Wimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milspec Products, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Samaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Summers
Represented By: John R. Samaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?