CS Business Systems, Inc. et al v. Schar et al
Plaintiff: Won Y. Shin Trust, Brad Heckenberg, PJS Rental, LLC, CS Business Systems, Inc., Lana C. Heckenberg, Virginia L. Shelton, Won Y. Shin, James L. Shelton, Itz Group, LLC, Kathryn Sutherin and Bart Sutherin
Defendant: The Ryan Law Group, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, Paul E. Simonson, Rocking Red H, LLC, Paul Lebreux, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, Richard C. Arrighi, James D. Ryan, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, Randall F. Greene, David Burman, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, Michael J. Ryan, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Cullen D'Ambrosio, Ricky L. Scharich, Keith Clarke and DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC
Case Number: 5:2017cv00086
Filed: March 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ocala Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #249 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying as moot #252 Motion for Attorney Fees; finding as moot #276 Report and Recommendations. The Motions and Report are rendered moot by the parties settlement #281. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/12/2019. (SCM)
February 11, 2019 Filing 281 JOINT NOTICE Of Settlement of Filing All Defendant's by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Main Document All Defendants' Joint Notice of Settlement)(Ryan, James) Modified on 2/12/2019 (RLK).
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiffs, James Shelton and Virginia Shelton, to advise the Court on or before Wednesday, February 13, 2019, the status of their "settlement in principle," described in Docket Entry #277 and #278. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/11/2019. (JRJ)
November 13, 2018 Filing 279 RESPONSE re #278 Objection to Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate's Recommendations and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
November 1, 2018 Filing 278 OBJECTION re #276 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #249 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Rocking Red H, LLC, Paul E. Simonson, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investmen . (McCullough, E.)
October 18, 2018 Filing 277 NOTICE of settlement in principle by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC (Ryan, James)
October 18, 2018 Filing 276 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #249 and #252 MOTIONS for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 10/18/2018. (SC)
October 11, 2018 Filing 275 NOTICE OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson re #270 Judgment [Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment as to Brad Heckenberg and Lana Heckenberg] (Crosbie, Michael) Modified on 10/12/2018 (RLK).
September 27, 2018 Filing 274 REPLY to Response to Motion re #252 MOTION for Attorney Fees and notice of adoption, joinder and supplementation of DCS defendants motion for attorney fees and memorandum of law and amended declaration #260 filed by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James)
September 18, 2018 Set/reset deadlines as to #252 MOTION for Attorney Fees and notice of adoption, joinder and supplementation of DCS defendants motion for attorney fees and memorandum of law. Replies due by 9/27/2018. (RLK)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting #271 Motion for Leave to File Reply: Defendants' reply is due on or before September 27, 2018 and shall not exceed five pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/17/2018. (SC) Modified on 9/18/2018 (RLK).
September 17, 2018 Filing 272 REPLY to Response to Motion re #249 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Crosbie, Michael)
September 14, 2018 Filing 271 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Response In Opposition [Doc 266] to Ryan Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees and Declaration, & Memorandum of Law by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James)
September 10, 2018 Filing 270 JUDGMENT entered in favor of the DCS Defendants and against Brad Heckenberg in the amount of $26,910.39, and against Lana Heckenberg in the amount of $26,910.39. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (LAB)
September 10, 2018 Filing 269 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #264 Response in Opposition to Motion by James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(McCullough, E.)
September 10, 2018 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 9/17/2018. (LAB)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER adopting #259 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #233 Declaration filed by Rocking Red H, LLC, Paul E. Simonson, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Invest. The Revised Assessment of Attorney Fees (Doc. 233) is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of the DCS Defendants and against Brad Heckenberg in the amount of $26,910.39, and against Lana Heckenberg in the amount of $26,910.39. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/7/2018. (MMW)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #265 Motion for Leave to File Reply: Defendants' reply is due on or before September 17, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/7/2018. (SC)
September 7, 2018 Filing 266 RESPONSE in Opposition re #252 MOTION for Attorney Fees and notice of adoption, joinder and supplementation of DCS defendants motion for attorney fees and memorandum of law filed by James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 265 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
September 4, 2018 Filing 264 RESPONSE in Opposition re #249 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(McCullough, E.)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting #261 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motion for attorney's fees is due on or before September 3, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/28/2018. (SC)
August 27, 2018 Filing 262 SUPPLEMENT re #261 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #249 MOTION for Attorney Fees by James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 261 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #249 MOTION for Attorney Fees by James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
August 23, 2018 Filing 260 AMENDED DECLARATION of James D Ryan re #252 MOTION for Attorney Fees and notice of adoption, joinder and supplementation of DCS defendants motion for attorney fees and memorandum of law by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 1-6, #2 Exhibit A 7-12, #3 Exhibit A 13-19, #4 Exhibit A 20-28, #5 Exhibit A 29-38, #6 Exhibit B allocation table)(Ryan, James)
August 23, 2018 Filing 259 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #233 DCS Defendants' revised assessment of attorney's fees against Plaintiffs Brad Heckenberg and Lana Heckenberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/23/2018. (SC)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting #251 Motion for Extension of Time to File: Defendants' exhibits are due on or before August 23, 2018. Defendants' motion for leave to file a reply to Plaintiffs' response is DENIED as moot #256. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/21/2018. (SC)
August 20, 2018 Filing 257 RESPONSE re #250 Response in Opposition to Former Plaintiffs', Brad Heckenberg and Lana Heckenberg, Objection to Attorney's Fees Declaration of Michael Crosbie filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Crosbie, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 256 CORRECTED MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Response (doc. 253) (correcting formatting & scrivener errors) by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James) Modified on 8/20/2018 (HAQ).
August 17, 2018 Filing 255 MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Response (doc. 253) by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James)
August 17, 2018 Filing 254 SUPPLEMENT re #251 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File EXHIBIT TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW , #252 MOTION for Attorney Fees and notice of adoption, joinder and supplementation of DCS defendants motion for attorney fees and memorandum of law of RULE 3.01(g) certfications by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James)
August 17, 2018 Filing 253 RESPONSE in Opposition re #251 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File EXHIBIT TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW , #252 MOTION for Attorney Fees and notice of adoption, joinder and supplementation of DCS defendants motion for attorney fees and memorandum of law Insufficient 3.01(g) Conference filed by James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
August 16, 2018 Filing 252 MOTION for Attorney Fees and notice of adoption, joinder and supplementation of #249 DCS defendants motion for attorney fees and memorandum of law by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James D. Ryan, #2 Exhibit B - Motion for Enlargment re billing summary, #3 Exhibit C - Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions)(Ryan, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens, per Chamber's instruction. Modified on 8/17/2018 (HAQ).
August 16, 2018 Filing 251 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Exhibit to Motion for Attorney Fees And Memorandum of by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James) Modified on 8/17/2018 (HAQ).
August 13, 2018 Filing 250 RESPONSE (Objection)#233 DECLARATION of Michael D. Crosbie /i> filed by Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(McCullough, E.) Modified on 8/17/2018 (HAQ).
August 13, 2018 Filing 249 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C" (1 of 2), #4 Exhibit "C" (2 of 2), #5 Exhibit "D")(Crosbie, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens, per Chamber's instruction. Modified on 8/20/2018 (LMF).
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER permitting Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant's request for attorney's fees #233 on before August 13, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/3/2018. (SC)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #236 motion to dismiss. This action is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate any pending motions and to close the file.. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/2/2018. (ALJ)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER overruling Plaintiffs' Objections #234 to the Magistrate Judge's Order on Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/1/2018. (ALJ)
June 12, 2018 Filing 245 JOINDER in motion by Michael J. Ryan re #225 MOTION for order to show cause Why the Plaintiffs Should Not be Sanctioned for Failing to Comply with the Court's Order Regarding the Rico Case Statement filed by Rocking Red H, LLC, Paul E. Simonson, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, Ricky L. Scharich, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Richard C. Arrighi, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC . (Ryan, Michael)
June 12, 2018 Filing 244 NOTICE by Michael J. Ryan of Adoption and Joinder in DCS Defendants' Response #238 In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objection to Pretrial Order (Ryan, Michael)
June 12, 2018 Filing 243 NOTICE by Michael J. Ryan of Adoption and Joinder re #239 DCS Defendants' Response In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Voluntarily Dismiss (Ryan, Michael)
June 12, 2018 Filing 242 JOINDER in motion by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC re #225 MOTION for order to show cause Why the Plaintiffs Should Not be Sanctioned for Failing to Comply with the Court's Order Regarding the Rico Case Statement filed by Rocking Red H, LLC, Paul E. Simonson, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, Ricky L. Scharich, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Richard C. Arrighi, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC . (Ryan, James)
June 12, 2018 Filing 241 NOTICE by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC of Adoption and Joinder in DCS Defendants' Response #238 In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objection to Pretrial Order (Ryan, James)
June 12, 2018 Filing 240 NOTICE by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC of Adoption and Joinder re #239 DCS Defendants' Response In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Voluntarily Dismiss (Ryan, James)
May 23, 2018 Filing 239 RESPONSE in Opposition re #236 First MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
May 18, 2018 Filing 238 RESPONSE re #234 Objection DCS Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objection to Pretrial Order filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
May 17, 2018 Filing 237 RESPONSE re #233 Declaration filed by Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, PJS Rental, LLC, Won Y. Shin, Won Y. Shin Trust. (McCullough, E.)
May 9, 2018 Filing 236 First MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily by James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
May 7, 2018 Filing 235 REQUEST for oral argument re #234 Objection by PJS Rental, LLC, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton, Won Y. Shin, Won Y. Shin Trust. (McCullough, E.)
May 7, 2018 Filing 234 OBJECTION re #232 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees . (McCullough, E.)
May 7, 2018 Filing 233 DECLARATION of Michael D. Crosbie re #232 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (1 of 2), #2 Exhibit "A" (2 of 2), #3 Exhibit "B")(Crosbie, Michael)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting #220 Motion for Attorney Fees: The DCS Defendants are directed to provide a revised assessment of their reasonable attorney's fees on or before May 7, 2018. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/23/2018. (SC)
April 9, 2018 Filing 231 RESPONSE in Opposition re #225 MOTION for order to show cause Why the Plaintiffs Should Not be Sanctioned for Failing to Comply with the Court's Order Regarding the Rico Case Statement filed by James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER denying #229 Defendants Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, and the Ryan Law Group's Renewed Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/4/2018. (ALJ)
April 2, 2018 Filing 229 Renewed MOTION for Rule 11 Sanctions titled "Notice of re-filing Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions" by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan and The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ryan, James) Modified on 4/3/2018 (LMF).
March 28, 2018 Filing 228 RESPONSE in Opposition re #220 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
March 28, 2018 Filing 227 RESPONSE in Opposition re #217 MOTION to Strike filed by James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(McCullough, E.)
March 28, 2018 Filing 226 RESPONSE in Opposition re #224 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings as to Count III of the Amended Complaint filed by James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
March 26, 2018 Filing 225 MOTION for order to show cause Why the Plaintiffs Should Not be Sanctioned for Failing to Comply with the Court's Order Regarding the Rico Case Statement by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 14, 2018 Filing 224 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings as to Count III of the Amended Complaint by Randall F. Greene. (Partlow, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2018 Filing 223 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #211 Amended Complaint by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux.(Partlow, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2018 Filing 222 NOTICE by Michael J. Ryan re #221 Answer to amended complaint of Adpotion and Joinder in Ryan Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Verified Amended Complaint (Ryan, Michael)
March 14, 2018 Filing 221 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #211 Amended Complaint by James D. Ryan, Cullen D'Ambrosio and The Ryan Law Group, LLC . (James D. Ryan) 3/16/2018 (LAB).
March 14, 2018 Filing 220 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C" - 1 of 2, #4 Exhibit "C" - 2 of 2, #5 Composite Exhibit "D", #6 Composite Exhibit "E", #7 Composite Exhibit "F", #8 Exhibit "G", #9 Exhibit "H", #10 Exhibit "I")(Crosbie, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Modified on 3/15/2018 (LAB).
March 14, 2018 Filing 219 NOTICE by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson re #201 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on motion to dismiss, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction [DCS Defendants' Notice of Re-Filing Two Rule 11 Motions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C")(Crosbie, Michael) Modified on 3/15/2018 (LAB).
March 14, 2018 Filing 218 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #211 Amended Complaint by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson.(Crosbie, Michael) Modified on 3/15/2018 (LAB).
March 14, 2018 Filing 217 MOTION to Strike allegations in the plaintiffs' verified amended complaint and RICO case statement that are immaterial, impertinent, and scandalous by Richard C. Arrighi. (Crosbie, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Modified on 3/15/2018 (LAB).
March 12, 2018 Filing 216 RESPONSE re #201 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on motion to dismiss, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Rico Case Statement filed by James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.) Modified on 3/13/2018 (LAB).
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER re #214 Plaintiff's CS Business Systems, Inc. and Defendants' Joint Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by CS Business Systems, Inc. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate CS Business Systems, Inc. from the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/6/2018. (MMW)
March 5, 2018 Filing 214 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by CS Business Systems, Inc. (Aaron, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting #209 Motion to Substitute Attorney. See the order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/5/2018. (SC)
March 1, 2018 Filing 212 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #211 Amended Complaint Exhibits by James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21)(McCullough, E.)
February 28, 2018 Filing 211 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., Bella Collina Towers, LLC, David Burman, Keith Clarke, Cullen D'Ambrosio, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux, Rocking Red H, LLC, James D. Ryan, Michael J. Ryan, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson, The Ryan Law Group, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton.(McCullough, E.)
February 28, 2018 Filing 210 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to file amended complaint by CS Business Systems, Inc.. (Aaron, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
February 27, 2018 Filing 209 MOTION for substitution of Attorney titled "STIPULATION" by CS Business Systems, Inc. (Aaron, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/28/2018 (LAB).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #206 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs shall have until February 28, 2018, to file an Amended Complaint. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/20/2018. (ALJ)
February 18, 2018 Filing 207 RESPONSE in Opposition re #206 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint filed by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James)
February 16, 2018 Filing 206 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by CS Business Systems, Inc., James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ENDORSED ORDER granting #204 Motion for clarification. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is due on or before February 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/14/2018. (ALJ)
February 13, 2018 Filing 204 MOTION for clarification re #201 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on motion to dismiss, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Sanctions, and Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Ballante, Nicole) Modified on 2/15/2018 (LMF).
February 8, 2018 Filing 203 RESPONSE re #194 Objection Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objection to Pretrial Order filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B")(Crosbie, Michael) Modified on 2/9/2018 (HAQ).
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ENDORSED ORDER: The Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file a motion for class certification after the conclusion of all pleadings in this matter. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/7/2018. (MMW)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #48. The Complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice. Outstanding motions at #34 #43 #46 #124 #145 #167 #189 are denied as moot. Defendants' Motions for Sanctions #54 #155 #174 are denied without prejudice. Defendants may refile their sanctions motions at the conclusion of the pleading phase of the case. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/7/2018. (ALJ)
February 6, 2018 Filing 200 NOTICE to the Court re #177 Motion to compel by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich and Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael) Modified on 2/7/2018 (LMF).
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ENDORSED ORDER denying #125 DCS Defendants' Motion to Retain Jurisdiction over Shin and PJS. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/5/2018. (MMW)
February 5, 2018 Filing 198 NOTICE To The Court by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux (Partlow, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/6/2018 (HAQ).
January 30, 2018 Filing 197 RESPONSE in Opposition re #189 MOTION for leave to file Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Ryan Defendants' Motion for Sanctions filed by CS Business Systems, Inc., James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ENDORSED ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Request for Oral Argument re #194 Objection. The Court does not require the benefit of a hearing at this time. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/29/2018. (BAH)
January 26, 2018 Filing 195 REQUEST for oral argument re #194 Objection by CS Business Systems, Inc., James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
January 26, 2018 Filing 194 OBJECTION re #188 Order on Motion for Protective Order . (McCullough, E.)
January 26, 2018 Filing 193 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #167 Second MOTION for preliminary injunction by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(McCullough, E.)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER taking under advisement #177 Motion to Compel production of ESI in native format. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/25/2018. (SC)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ENDORSED ORDER denying #186 DCS Defendants' Motion to Retain Jurisdiction Brad Heckenberg and Lana C. Heckenberg. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/24/2018. (MMW)
January 22, 2018 Filing 190 RESPONSE to Motion re #186 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Retain Jurisdiction over Brad Heckenberg and Lana C. Heckenberg filed by Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg. (McCullough, E.)
January 16, 2018 Filing 189 MOTION for leave to file Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Ryan Defendants' Motion for Sanctions by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting #156 Motion for Protective Order. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/12/2018. (SC)
January 11, 2018 Filing 187 RESPONSE in Opposition re #177 MOTION to Compel plaintiffs James L. Shelton and Brad Heckenberg to produce ESI in native format filed by Brad Heckenberg, James L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
January 8, 2018 Filing 186 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Retain Jurisdiction over Brad Heckenberg and Lana C. Heckenberg by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
January 5, 2018 Filing 185 RESPONSE in Opposition re #174 MOTION for sanctions [Rule 11] filed by CS Business Systems, Inc., James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
January 5, 2018 Filing 184 NOTICE by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux re #48 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(h) (Partlow, Jeffrey)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER re #178 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal -- Heckenbergs Only, without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Brad Heckenberg and Lana C. Heckenberg ONLY from the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/3/2018. (MMW)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #157 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: Mr. Ippoliti is granted leave to withdraw. However, the Court will retain jurisdiction over Mr. Ippoliti at this time. The Clerk is directed to continue to send Mr. Ippoliti electronic notices of all filings in this case. See the order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/3/2018. (SC)
January 2, 2018 Filing 181 RESPONSE in Opposition re #156 MOTION for protective order filed by CS Business Systems, Inc., James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ENDORSED ORDER re #170 Notice of withdrawal of motion filed by Lana C. Heckenberg, Brad Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, CS Business Systems, Inc., Virginia L. Shelton. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the motion at #165. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/2/2018. (MMW)
December 28, 2017 Filing 179 NOTICE by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC of Filing in Support of Motion to Dismiss #50 and Motion for Sanctions #174 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ryan, James)
December 28, 2017 Filing 178 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Brad Heckenberg)(McCullough, E.)
December 28, 2017 Filing 177 MOTION to Compel plaintiffs James L. Shelton and Brad Heckenberg to produce ESI in native format by DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Composite Exhibit "A", #2 Composite Exhibit "B")(Crosbie, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
December 28, 2017 Filing 176 RESPONSE in Opposition re #167 Second MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Composite Exhibit "E")(Crosbie, Michael)
December 28, 2017 Filing 175 RESPONSE in Opposition re #167 Second MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Partlow, Jeffrey)
December 22, 2017 Filing 174 MOTION for sanctions [Rule 11] by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James)
December 22, 2017 Filing 173 NOTICE of filing related case orders by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC of Filing Related Case Orders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CSBS Partial Summary Jmnt, #2 Exhibit Sheltons Partial Summary Jmnt)(Ryan, James) Modified on 12/26/2017 (HAQ).
December 21, 2017 Filing 172 RESPONSE re #160 Notice (Other) filed by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(McCullough, E.)
December 20, 2017 Set/reset deadlines as to #156 MOTION for protective order . Responses due by 1/2/2018 (LAB)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER: Plaintiffs are directed to respond to #156 DCS Defendants' motion for a protective order on or before January 2, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 12/19/2017. (SC)
December 15, 2017 Filing 170 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton re #165 Second MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Lana C. Heckenberg, Brad Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, CS Business Systems, Inc., Virginia L. Shelton (McCullough, E.)
December 15, 2017 Filing 169 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Choo re: #167 Second MOTION for preliminary injunction by CS Business Systems, Inc.. (McCullough, E.)
December 15, 2017 Filing 168 RESPONSE re #166 Order, #163 Response in Opposition to Motion, #164 Response in Opposition to Motion to Withdraw filed by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (Ippoliti, James)
December 14, 2017 Filing 167 Second MOTION for preliminary injunction by CS Business Systems, Inc., James L. Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Affidavit)(McCullough, E.)
December 13, 2017 Set/reset deadlines as to Reply to docs. Replies to docs. 163 & 164 due by 12/27/2017. (LAB)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER: Mr. Ippoliti is DIRECTED to file a reply to Docs. #163 and #164 on or before December 27, 2017. See the order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 12/12/2017. (SC)
December 11, 2017 Filing 165 Second MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
December 11, 2017 Filing 164 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 Amended MOTION for Jim Ippoliti to withdraw as attorney filed by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
December 11, 2017 Filing 163 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 Amended MOTION for Jim Ippoliti to withdraw as attorney filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #161 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for failing to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). The motion is not seeking injunctive relief and therefore the moving party must meet and confer with opposing counsel. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/11/2017. (BAH)
December 8, 2017 Filing 161 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
December 7, 2017 Filing 160 NOTICE of Filing in Support of DCS Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Second Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions by plaintiffs re #155 Second MOTION for sanctions [Rule 11], #54 MOTION for sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B")(Crosbie, Michael) Modified on 12/8/2017 (HAQ). Modified on 12/11/2017 (HAQ).
December 7, 2017 Filing 159 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding the exhibits attached pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 201(c)(2) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit "2", #3 Exhibit "3", #4 Exhibit "4")(Crosbie, Michael) Modified on 12/11/2017 (HAQ).
December 4, 2017 Filing 158 NOTICE to the court pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(h) by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux (Partlow, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/5/2017 (HAQ).
November 27, 2017 Filing 157 Amended MOTION for Jim Ippoliti to withdraw as attorney by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (Ippoliti, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
November 22, 2017 Filing 156 MOTION for protective order by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Composite Exhibit "A", #2 Composite Exhibit "B", #3 Composite Exhibit "C")(Crosbie, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
November 22, 2017 Filing 155 Second MOTION for sanctions [Rule 11] by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying without prejudice #152 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: the motion fails to comply with Local Rules 2.03(b) and 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 11/16/2017. (SC)
November 13, 2017 Filing 153 RESPONSE in Opposition re #152 MOTION for Jim Ippoliti to withdraw as attorney filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
November 13, 2017 Filing 152 MOTION for Jim Ippoliti to withdraw as attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Ippoliti, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
November 6, 2017 Filing 151 NOTICE by Michael J. Ryan re #145 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Amended Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Memorandum of Law. of Adoption, Joinder In POA & DCS Defendants' Responses [148, 149] & with Ryan Defendants' Supplementation #150. (Ryan, Michael)
November 6, 2017 Filing 150 NOTICE by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC re #145 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Amended Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Memorandum of Law. of Adoption, Joinder In POA & DCS Defendants' Responses [148, 149] with Supplementation. (Ryan, James)
November 6, 2017 Filing 149 RESPONSE in Opposition re #145 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Amended Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Memorandum of Law. filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E", #6 Exhibit "F")(Crosbie, Michael)
November 6, 2017 Filing 148 RESPONSE to Motion re #145 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Amended Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Memorandum of Law. filed by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Partlow, Jeffrey)
November 3, 2017 Filing 147 NOTICE to the Court re #48 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene and Paul Lebreux. (Partlow, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/6/2017 (LMF).
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER re #139 DCS Real Estate Investment's request for attorney's fees. See the order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 10/24/2017. (SC)
October 23, 2017 Filing 145 AMENDED Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Memorandum of Law by CS Business Systems, Inc.. (LAB) (LMF).
October 23, 2017 Set/reset deadlines as to #145 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Amended Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Memorandum of Law. Responses due by 11/6/2017. (LAB)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #138 Motion for Leave to File: The Clerk is directed to docket Exhibit A of (Doc. 138): "Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Memorandum of Law." The Clerk is directed to terminate as moot (Doc. 118). Any response to Plaintiffs' amended motion is due on or before November 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 10/20/2017. (SC)
October 3, 2017 Filing 143 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #136 Order on Motion for Sanctions filed by Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
October 2, 2017 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Jarolem on behalf of Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., David Burman (Jarolem, Richard) Modified on 10/3/2017 (LAB).
October 2, 2017 Filing 141 RESPONSE to Motion re #138 MOTION for leave to file Amended Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum filed by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Partlow, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2017 Filing 140 RESPONSE in Opposition re #138 MOTION for leave to file Amended Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
September 19, 2017 Filing 139 NOTICE by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson re #136 Order on Motion for Sanctions [Notice of Filing Declaration of Michael D. Crosbie in Support of DCS's Assessment of Expenses] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Crosbie)(Crosbie, Michael)
September 19, 2017 Filing 138 MOTION for leave to file Amended Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ippoliti, James)
September 6, 2017 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Defendants shall provide an assessment of their reasonable expenses by 9/19/2017. Responses due by 9/19/2017. (LAB)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #132 Motion to Strike Exhibit A of Doc 121. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on September 5, 2017. (SC)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Sanctions: Defendants shall provide an assessment of their reasonable expenses by September 19, 2017. Plaintiffs' response is due October 3, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 09/05/2017. (SC)
August 25, 2017 Filing 135 RESPONSE in Opposition re #132 First MOTION to Strike Exhibit A of Doc. 121 filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
August 24, 2017 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re #124 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Postpone Determination of Class Certification or, Alternatively, to Extend the Time to Respond to the Motion for Class Certification filed by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (Ippoliti, James)
August 23, 2017 Filing 133 SUPPLEMENT - re #132 First MOTION to Strike Exhibit A of Doc. 121 of filing Local Rule 3.01(g) statement by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.) Modified on 8/24/2017 (LMF).
August 21, 2017 Filing 132 First MOTION to Strike Exhibit A of Doc. 121 by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McCullough, E.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Modified on 8/22/2017 (LMF).
August 21, 2017 Filing 131 NOTICE of Adoption and Joinder in re #128 Response in Opposition to Motion, #127 Response to motion and#129 Notice of Adoption and Joinder by Michael J. Ryan. (Ryan, Michael) Modified on 8/22/2017 (LMF).
August 21, 2017 Filing 130 NOTICE of Adoption and Joinder in re #124 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Postpone Determination of Class Certification or, Alternatively, to Extend the Time to Respond to the Motion for Class Certification by Michael J. Ryan. (Ryan, Michael) Modified on 8/22/2017 (LMF).
August 18, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE of Adoption, Joinder and Supplementation re #128 Response in Opposition to Motion and #127 Response to motion by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan and The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James) Modified on 8/21/2017 (LMF).
August 18, 2017 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re #118 First MOTION to Certify Class filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C")(Crosbie, Michael)
August 18, 2017 Filing 127 RESPONSE to Motion re #118 First MOTION to Certify Class filed by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux. (Partlow, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2017 Filing 126 NOTICE by The Ryan Law Group, LLC re #124 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Postpone Determination of Class Certification or, Alternatively, to Extend the Time to Respond to the Motion for Class Certification of Adoption and Joinder (Ryan, James)
August 14, 2017 Filing 125 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Retain Jurisdiction Over Shin and PJS by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
August 14, 2017 Filing 124 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Postpone Determination of Class Certification or, Alternatively, to Extend the Time to Respond to the Motion for Class Certification by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #119 the Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Charles Nicholas Dorman is terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/9/2017. (CAB)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER re #117 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of Won Y. Shin Trust, whose Trustee is Won Y. Shin, filed by Won Y. Shin, Won Y. Shin Trust. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Won Y. Shin Trust, whose Trustee is Won Y Shin ONLY from the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/7/2017. (MMW)
August 7, 2017 Filing 121 NOTICE by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson re #54 MOTION for sanctions [Notice of Filing in Support of DCS Defendants' Motion for Sanctions] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Crosbie, Michael)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER re #116 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal for PJS Rental, without Prejudice, filed by PJS Rental, LLC. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate PJS Rental ONLY from the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/7/2017. (MMW)
August 7, 2017 Filing 119 MOTION to Substitute Attorney titled "Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton and Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.) Modified on 8/7/2017 (LMF).
August 4, 2017 Filing 118 First MOTION to Certify Class by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
August 4, 2017 Filing 117 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Won Y. Shin, Won Y. Shin Trust (McCullough, E.)
August 4, 2017 Filing 116 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by PJS Rental, LLC (McCullough, E.)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER re #101 Defendant Rick L. Scharich's request for attorney's fees. See the order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 7/17/2017. (CAB)
July 13, 2017 Filing 114 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #94 Order on motion to compel filed by CS Business Systems, Inc.. (McCullough, E.)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER re #100 Defendants Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments,LLC, and DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC,'s request for attorney's fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 7/12/2017. (CAB)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER re #111 Plaintiffs', Bart Sutherin and Katheryn Sutherin, Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Plaintiffs Barth Sutherin and Katheryn Sutherin, ONLY from the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/10/2017. (ALJ)
July 7, 2017 Filing 111 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Bart Sutherin, Kathryn Sutherin (Quimby, Paul)
July 7, 2017 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Alexander Quimby on behalf of Bart Sutherin, Kathryn Sutherin (Quimby, Paul)
July 3, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE of compliance for Production of Documents and Responses by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton, Bart Sutherin, Kathryn Sutherin (McCullough, E.)
July 1, 2017 Filing 108 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #84 Order on motion to compel filed by CS Business Systems, Inc., Bart Sutherin, Kathryn Sutherin. (McCullough, E.)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #89 the Motion to extend time. Plaintiffs may move to certify a class on or before August 4, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/30/2017. (CAB)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER re #84; discharing the order to show cause as to Plaintiff ITZ Group, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/23/2017. (CAB)
June 23, 2017 Filing 105 RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION for sanctions filed by Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER re #96 Plaintiff, ITZ Group, LLC's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Itz Group, LLC. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Plaintiff, ITZ Group, LLC ONLY from the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/22/2017. (MMW)
June 21, 2017 Filing 103 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #84 Order on motion to compel filed by Itz Group, LLC. (Hazouri, Kenneth)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ENDORSED ORDER granting #97 the unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. CS Business Systems, Inc., Bart Sutherin, and Kathryn Sutherin may respond to the discovery requests at issue on or before June 30, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/20/2017. (CAB)
June 20, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson re #94 Order on motion to compel Notice of Filing Declaration of Michael D. Crosbie in Support of Rick L. Scharich's Assessment of Expenses (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Crosbie)(Crosbie, Michael)
June 20, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson re #84 Order on motion to compel Notice of Filing Declaration of Michael D. Crosbie in Support of DCS's Assessment of Expenses (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Crosbie)(Crosbie, Michael)
June 19, 2017 Filing 99 SUPPLEMENT re #97 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery 10 Days Rule 3.01(g) Certification Update by CS Business Systems, Inc., Bart Sutherin, Kathryn Sutherin. (McCullough, E.)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #88 the Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. See the order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/16/2017. (CAB)
June 16, 2017 Filing 97 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery 10 Days by CS Business Systems, Inc., Bart Sutherin, Kathryn Sutherin. (McCullough, E.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
June 16, 2017 Filing 96 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Itz Group, LLC (Hazouri, Kenneth)
June 16, 2017 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth P. Hazouri on behalf of Itz Group, LLC (Hazouri, Kenneth)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #83 the Motion to Compel production of documents. See the order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/15/2017. (CAB)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying #63 the Motion for Protective Order. See the order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/15/2017. (CAB)
June 13, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson re #87 MOTION for sanctions (Crosbie, Michael)
June 12, 2017 Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 First MOTION to extend time to 60 days for Class Certification filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
June 12, 2017 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
June 9, 2017 Filing 89 First MOTION to extend time to 60 days for Class Certification by All Plaintiffs. (McCullough, E.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
June 9, 2017 Filing 88 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
June 9, 2017 Filing 87 MOTION for sanctions by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #80 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/7/2017. (MMW)
June 6, 2017 Filing 85 RESPONSE TO #80 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, Itz Group, LLC, PJS Rental, LLC, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton, Won Y. Shin, Bart Sutherin, Kathryn Sutherin, Won Y. Shin Trust. (McCullough, E.) (Left counsel voicemail to clarify first page of this pleading.) Modified on 6/7/2017 (MJT).
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #77 the Motion to Compel filed by Defendants Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, and DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC. See the order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/6/2017. (CAB)
May 31, 2017 Filing 83 MOTION to Compel CS Business Systems, Inc.'s Responses to Rick L. Scharich's First Request for Production by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Crosbie, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
May 31, 2017 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2017, Discovery due by 6/1/2018, Dispositive motions due by 7/2/2018, Pretrial statement due by 9/18/2018, All other motions due by 9/25/2018, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 3:00 P.M. before District Judge Paul G. Byron, Courtroom 4B, Jury Trial Term beginning 11/5/2018, 9:00 A.M. Conduct mediation hearing by 6/15/2018. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 5/1/2018, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 4/2/2018. (LAB)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/30/2017. (MMW)
May 26, 2017 Filing 81 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (McCullough, E.)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to all Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by a written response filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution due to the non-filing of a Case Management Report. Failure to respond shall result in a dismissal of this action without further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/25/2017. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER terminating as moot #70 the Motion to Compel the production of documents and granting #71 the Motion for Extension of Time. See the order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 5/19/2017. (CAB)
May 19, 2017 Filing 78 DECLARATION of PLAINTIFFS' by CS Business Systems, Inc.. (McCullough, E.)
May 18, 2017 Filing 77 MOTION to Compel CS Business Systems, Inc., Bart Sutherin, and Kathryn Sutherin's Responses to its First Request for Production and ITZ Group LLC's Responses to its First Set of Interrogatories by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite "A", #2 Exhibit "B")(Crosbie, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
May 15, 2017 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION for sanctions filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Crosbie, Michael)
May 15, 2017 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #70 MOTION filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
May 12, 2017 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION for protective order and stay discovery directed at them filed by CS Business Systems, Inc.. (McCullough, E.)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying #72 Motion for Leave to File a sur reply nunc pro tunc by All Plaintiffs. The Court does not require additional briefing at this time. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/12/2017. (ALJ) Modified on 5/15/2017 (LMF).
May 11, 2017 Filing 72 First MOTION for leave to file sur reply nunc pro tunc by All Plaintiffs. (McCullough, E.)
May 11, 2017 Filing 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #70 MOTION to Compel Responses to First Request for Production by CS Business Systems, Inc.. (McCullough, E.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Modified on 5/12/2017 (MJT).
May 11, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION to Compel Responses to First Request for Production by DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit "A")(Crosbie, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ENDORSED ORDER granting #67 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants' may file a four (4) page reply on or before May 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/10/2017. (ALJ)
May 9, 2017 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #55 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to DCS Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by CS Business Systems, Inc.. (McCullough, E.)
May 9, 2017 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson re #54 MOTION for sanctions Notice of Excluding Whatley Kallas (Crosbie, Michael)
May 4, 2017 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #54 MOTION for sanctions filed by CS Business Systems, Inc.. (McCullough, E.)
May 2, 2017 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 MOTION to Dismiss complaint , #43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint , #58 MOTION to extend time to, #48 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss complaint filed by CS Business Systems, Inc.. (McCullough, E.)
April 28, 2017 Filing 63 MOTION for protective order and stay discovery directed at them by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Affidavit of Paul E. Simonson)(Crosbie, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
April 27, 2017 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #58 Defendant Michael J. Ryan's unopposed motion to deem his notice of adoption and joinder #53 timely filed and granting #59 Ryan's motion for authorization to use the CM/ECF filing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/25/2017. (CAB)
April 24, 2017 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Replies due by 5/5/2017. (LAB)
April 21, 2017 Filing 60 SUPPLEMENT re #51 Notice to take judicial notice rule 3.01 (g) statement by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER adopting #42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #10 MOTION for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by PJS Rental, LLC, Kathryn Sutherin, Brad Heckenberg, Bart Sutherin, Virginia L. Shelton, Lana C. Heckenberg, Won Y. Shin, Itz. The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/21/2017. (MMW)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ENDORSED ORDER granting #55 Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' shall file a reply, not to exceed six (6) pages, on or before May 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/21/2017. (ALJ)
April 20, 2017 Filing 59 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for authorization to use the CM/ECF filing system by Michael J. Ryan. (LAB)
April 20, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION to extend time to out of time re Notice of Adoption and Joinder in all defendants' Motions to Dismiss Complaint by CS Business Systems, Inc. filed by Michael J. Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LAB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Modified on 4/21/2017 (LAB).
April 20, 2017 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to DCS Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
April 20, 2017 Filing 54 MOTION for sanctions by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
April 18, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE of Filing in Suppport by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Notice of Filing in Support of DCS Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Crosbie, Michael) Modified on 4/19/2017 (LAB).
April 17, 2017 Filing 53 JOINDER in motion by Michael J. Ryan re #48 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss complaint filed by Keith Clarke, Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., Paul Lebreux, Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Randall F. Greene, David Burman. (Michael J. Ryan) (LAB)
April 14, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding #43 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #48 MOTION to Dismiss complaint and #50 Notice of Joinder in Motions to Dismiss with Supplementation by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ExA - Stipulation of Facts)(Ryan, James) Modified on 4/17/2017 (LMF).
April 14, 2017 Filing 50 JOINDER in motions to dismiss with supplementation re #48 MOTION to Dismiss complaint and #43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan and The Ryan Law Group, LLC (Ryan, James) Modified on 4/17/2017 (LMF).
April 14, 2017 Filing 49 RESPONSE in opposition to Motion re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with incorporated memorandum of law filed by CS Business Systems, Inc. (McCullough, E.) Modified on 4/17/2017 (LMF).
April 14, 2017 Filing 48 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene and Paul Lebreux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit)(Partlow, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/17/2017 (LMF).
April 14, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit)(Partlow, Jeffrey)
April 7, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to file Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Twenty-Five Pages by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux. (Partlow, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2017 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Require RICO Case Statement filed by CS Business Systems, Inc.. (McCullough, E.)
March 31, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Nicholas Dorman on behalf of CS Business Systems, Inc., Brad Heckenberg, Lana C. Heckenberg, Itz Group, LLC, PJS Rental, LLC, James L. Shelton, Virginia L. Shelton, Won Y. Shin, Bart Sutherin, Kathryn Sutherin, Won Y. Shin Trust (Dorman, Charles)
March 31, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #10 Plaintiffs' MOTION for a temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/31/2017. (CAB)
March 30, 2017 Filing 41 JOINDER in motion and NOTICE of Adoption re #34 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Require RICO Case Statement by Michael J. Ryan. (BMN)
March 29, 2017 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for All Defendants. Answer due by 4/14/2017. (LAB)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying #8 Defendants' Motion for a More Definite Statement; granting #9 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants may answer the Complaint or otherwise respond on or before April 14, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/28/2017. (CAB)
March 27, 2017 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Michael J. Ryan. (LAB)
March 27, 2017 Filing 38 JOINDER in motion and NOTICE of Adoption; re #34 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Require RICO Case Statement by The Ryan Law Group, LLC, Cullen D'Ambrosio and James D. Ryan. (Ryan, James) Modified on 3/29/2017 (LAB).
March 27, 2017 Filing 37 JOINDER in motion by Paul Lebreux re #34 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Require RICO Case Statement filed by Rocking Red H, LLC, Paul E. Simonson, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, Ricky L. Scharich, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Richard C. Arrighi, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC . (Partlow, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2017 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Interested persons order by Cullen D'Ambrosio, James D. Ryan, The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James)
March 23, 2017 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(Partlow, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Require RICO Case Statement by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Crosbie, Michael)
March 21, 2017 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux. (Partlow, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux. Related case(s): yes (Partlow, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2017 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement of Ryan Defendants filed by CS Business Systems, Inc.. (McCullough, E.) Modified on 3/22/2017 (LAB).
March 20, 2017 Filing 30 AMENDED RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement corrected with attachment filed by CS Business Systems, Inc.. (McCullough, E.) Modified on 3/22/2017 (LAB).
March 20, 2017 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law filed by CS Business Systems, Inc.. (McCullough, E.)
March 16, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE of Joinder in, and Supplementation of DCS defendants'#8 MOTION for More Definite Statement and SUPPLEMENT to #21MOTION for More Definite Statement by Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux (Partlow, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/17/2017 (LAB).
March 15, 2017 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Interested persons order by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
March 13, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Adoption of and Joinder in re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion for temporary restraining Order and preliminary injunction and #22 Notice of adoption and joinder with supplementation by Michael J. Ryan. (LMF)
March 13, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Adoption and Joinder in re #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement and #21 Notice of adoption and Joinder with supplementation by Michael J. Ryan. (LMF)
March 13, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Adoption and Joinder in re #16 Notice of pendency of related cases and #20 Notice of adoption and joinder with supplementation by Michael J. Ryan. (LMF)
March 13, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance Michael J. Ryan, pro-se trial counsel by Michael J. Ryan. (LMF)
March 10, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Adoption and Joinder re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion re #10 Motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction with Supplementation by James D. Ryan, Cullen D'Ambrosio and The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James) Modified on 3/13/2017 (LMF).
March 10, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Adoption and Joinder re #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Supplementation by James D. Ryan, Cullen D'Ambrosio and The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James) Modified on 3/13/2017 (LMF).
March 10, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Adoption of and Joinder in re #16 Notice of pendency of related cases with Supplementation by James D. Ryan, Cullen D'Ambrosio and The Ryan Law Group, LLC. (Ryan, James) Modified on 3/13/2017 (LMF).
March 10, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Ryan on behalf of The Ryan Law Group, LLC (Ryan, James)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/10/2017. (GNB) copies e-mailed
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/10/2017. (GNB) copies e-mailed
March 8, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. Related case(s): y (Crosbie, Michael)
March 8, 2017 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael)
March 7, 2017 Filing 14 Case transferred in from Orlando Division on 03/03/2017 Case Number 6:17-cv-364. Case assigned to District Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New Case Number: 5:17-cv-00086-PGB-PRL. (LAB)
March 6, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Bredahl Gierke on behalf of Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux (Gierke, Christina)
March 6, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Michael Partlow on behalf of Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc., Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc., David Burman, Keith Clarke, Randall F. Greene, Paul Lebreux (Partlow, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2017 Filing 11 VERIFIED summary re #1 Complaint by James L. Shelton. (McCullough, E.) Modified on 3/6/2017 (LMM).
March 3, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (McCullough, E.) Modified on 3/6/2017 (LMM).
March 3, 2017 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael) Modified on 3/6/2017 (LMM).
March 3, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Ricky L. Scharich, Paul E. Simonson. (Crosbie, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Modified on 3/24/2017 (LAB).
March 3, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by All Plaintiffs Related case(s): YES (McCullough, E.) Modified on 3/6/2017 (LMM).
March 3, 2017 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by All Plaintiffs. (McCullough, E.) Modified on 3/6/2017 (LMM).
March 3, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David Crosbie, Jennifer P. Sommerville, Nicole Ballante on behalf of Ricky L. Scharich (Crosbie, Michael) Modified on 3/6/2017 (LMM).
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER transferring case to the Ocala Division. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/3/2017. (ZRR)
March 3, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David Crosbie, Jennifer P. Sommerville, Nicole Ballante on behalf of Richard C. Arrighi, Bella Collina Towers, LLC, DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC, DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC, Rocking Red H, LLC, Dwight C. Schar, Paul E. Simonson (Crosbie, Michael) Modified on 3/6/2017 (LMM).
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/3/2017. (ZRR)
March 2, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, Motion for TRO and Injunctive Relief Sought (Filing fee $400 receipt number ORL061322) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(JET) Modified on 3/2/2017 (JET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CS Business Systems, Inc. et al v. Schar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ryan Law Group, LLC
Represented By: James D. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCS Real Estate Investments V, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Perry Sommerville
Represented By: Nicole Louise Ballante
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Simonson
Represented By: Jennifer Perry Sommerville
Represented By: Nicole Louise Ballante
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocking Red H, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Perry Sommerville
Represented By: Nicole Louise Ballante
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Lebreux
Represented By: Christina Bredahl Gierke
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Partlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCS Real Estate Investments IV, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Perry Sommerville
Represented By: Nicole Louise Ballante
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCS Real Estate Investments III, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Perry Sommerville
Represented By: Nicole Louise Ballante
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Community Management Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Bredahl Gierke
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Partlow
Represented By: Richard A. Jarolem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Collina Property Owners Assoc., Inc.
Represented By: Christina Bredahl Gierke
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Partlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCS Investments Holdings GP, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Perry Sommerville
Represented By: Nicole Louise Ballante
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C. Arrighi
Represented By: Jennifer Perry Sommerville
Represented By: Nicole Louise Ballante
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Ryan
Represented By: James D. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCS Real Estate Investments I, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Perry Sommerville
Represented By: Nicole Louise Ballante
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall F. Greene
Represented By: Christina Bredahl Gierke
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Partlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Burman
Represented By: Christina Bredahl Gierke
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Partlow
Represented By: Richard A. Jarolem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCS Real Estate Investments, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Perry Sommerville
Represented By: Nicole Louise Ballante
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCS Real Estate Investments IV-A, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Perry Sommerville
Represented By: Nicole Louise Ballante
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Ryan
Represented By: Michael John Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Collina Towers, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Perry Sommerville
Represented By: Nicole Louise Ballante
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight C. Schar
Represented By: Jennifer Perry Sommerville
Represented By: Nicole Louise Ballante
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cullen D'Ambrosio
Represented By: James D. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky L. Scharich
Represented By: Jennifer Perry Sommerville
Represented By: Nicole Louise Ballante
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Clarke
Represented By: Christina Bredahl Gierke
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Partlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCS Real Estate Investments II, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Perry Sommerville
Represented By: Nicole Louise Ballante
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Won Y. Shin Trust
Represented By: James Ippoliti
Represented By: E. Timothy McCullough
Represented By: Charles Nicholas Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Heckenberg
Represented By: James Ippoliti
Represented By: E. Timothy McCullough
Represented By: Charles Nicholas Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PJS Rental, LLC
Represented By: James Ippoliti
Represented By: E. Timothy McCullough
Represented By: Charles Nicholas Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CS Business Systems, Inc.
Represented By: James Ippoliti
Represented By: David Scott Oliver
Represented By: E. Timothy McCullough
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Aaron
Represented By: Charles Nicholas Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana C. Heckenberg
Represented By: James Ippoliti
Represented By: E. Timothy McCullough
Represented By: Charles Nicholas Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia L. Shelton
Represented By: James Ippoliti
Represented By: E. Timothy McCullough
Represented By: Charles Nicholas Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Won Y. Shin
Represented By: James Ippoliti
Represented By: E. Timothy McCullough
Represented By: Charles Nicholas Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Shelton
Represented By: James Ippoliti
Represented By: E. Timothy McCullough
Represented By: Charles Nicholas Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itz Group, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth P. Hazouri
Represented By: James Ippoliti
Represented By: E. Timothy McCullough
Represented By: Charles Nicholas Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Sutherin
Represented By: James Ippoliti
Represented By: Paul Alexander Quimby
Represented By: E. Timothy McCullough
Represented By: Charles Nicholas Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart Sutherin
Represented By: James Ippoliti
Represented By: Paul Alexander Quimby
Represented By: E. Timothy McCullough
Represented By: Charles Nicholas Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?