Roor International BV et al v. Puff's Tobacco, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Jeffrey A Hanstein and Puff's Tobacco, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00187
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jeffrey A Hanstein, Puff's Tobacco, LLC.(Minerley, Kenneth) Modified on 6/27/2019 (HAI).
May 17, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for All Defendants. Answer due by 5/27/2019. (HAQ)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants' answer or response is due by May 27, 2019. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/16/2019. (SMB)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jeffrey A Hanstein, Puff's Tobacco, LLC. Related case(s): no (Minerley, Kenneth)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Jeffrey A Hanstein, Puff's Tobacco, LLC. (Minerley, Kenneth)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 4/24/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Puff's Tobacco, LLC. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 4/24/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Jeffrey A Hanstein. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 4/16/2019. (AC)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Docket sheet) (LAB)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Jeffrey A Hanstein. (LAB)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Puff's Tobacco, LLC. (LAB)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:19-cv-187-Oca-30PRL. (SJB)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15351005) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Puff's Tobacco, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A Hanstein
Represented By: Kenneth L. Minerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puff's Tobacco, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth L. Minerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?