Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.174.8.201

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 67.174.8.201
Case Number: 5:2019cv00215
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #11 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of John Doe. This cause is dismissed without prejudice. All pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/24/2019. (SMB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Mamone, Tyler)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/15/2019. (SMB)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Mamone, Tyler)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): n (Mamone, Tyler)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 5/3/2019. (SMB)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 Copyright Report sent to Washington with copy of complaint and public docket sheet. (LAB)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:19-cv-215-Oca-30PRL. (SJB)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Mamone, Tyler)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): no (Mamone, Tyler)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 COPYRIGHT RERPORT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mamone, Tyler) Modified on 5/2/2019 (HAQ).
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 67.174.8.201 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15418282) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mamone, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.174.8.201
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 67.174.8.201
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Tyler Mamone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?