Castro v. Fluor Daniel Services Corporation
Plaintiff: Mary Castro
Defendant: Fluor Daniel Services Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00580
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/14/2020; Dispositive motions due by 9/14/2020; Pretrial Conference set for THURSDAY, JANUARY 7, 2021 at 10:15 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr. Jury Trial set for the FEBRUARY 2021 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/10/2019. (KAC)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Berman, Craig)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation.(McGlynn, Lisa)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Mary Castro. Related case(s): no (Berman, Craig)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 11/19/2019. (SMB)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:19-cv-580-Oc-30PRL. (SJB)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #1 Notice of Removal by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal)(McGlynn, Lisa)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial Circuit, case number 2019-CA-000866 filed in State Court on 10/4/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16147075 filed by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal)(McGlynn, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. Fluor Daniel Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Daniel Services Corporation
Represented By: Lisa Ann McGlynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Castro
Represented By: Craig L. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?