Gillespie v. Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Appellant: Neil Gillespie
Appellee: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00585
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE to counsel Melbalynn Fisher of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LMF)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On or before February 3, 2020, Appellant shall file his initial brief and show cause by a written response filed by this same date, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 1/13/2020. (JW)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #7 Motion to File Electronically; denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #8 Motion For Advice of Counsel; denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 12/23/2019. (JMF)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File initial brief by Neil Gillespie. (LMF)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Advice of Counsel by Neil Gillespie. (LMF)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to file electronically by Neil Gillespie. (LMF)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Appellant's Motion for Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 11/27/2019. (JW)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for preliminary injunction or MOTION for temporary restraining order by Neil Gillespie. (LMF)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 11/18/19. (LMF)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. The parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with the procedures and deadlines established under the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, Rule 8018. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/21/2019. (JW)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Neil Gillespie. (Attachments: #1 3-19-bk-00808_2Docket_Notice_of_Appeal_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Required_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #2 3-19-bk-00808_3Docket_Amended_Order_Dismissing_Case_with_Injunction_Period_of_365_days_Barred_Debtor_Gillespie, #3 3-19-bk-00808_4Docket_000205_Part_1_Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal_and_Notice_of_Paying_A, #4 3-19-bk-00808_5Docket_000205_Part_2_Documents, #5 3-19-bk-00808_6Docket_000205_Part_3_Documents, #6 3-19-bk-00808_7Docket_000205_Part_4_Documents, #7 3-19-bk-00808_8Docket, #8 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_13_Installments, #9 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000002_Bankruptcy_Petition_Preparers_Notice_and_Declaration_and_Disclosure_of_Compensation_filed, #10 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000003_Application_to_Pay_Filing_Fee_in_Installments_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #11 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000004_Statement_of_Debtors_Social_Security_Numbers_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #12 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000005_Certificate_of_Credit_Counseling_Date_Course_was_Completed_3619_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil, #13 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000006_Fifth_Amended_Administrative_Order_FLMB-2018-2_Prescribing_Procedures_for_Chapter_13_Cases, #14 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000007_Part_1_Notice_of_Commencement_of_Case_Section_341_Meeting_of_Creditors_and_Fixing_Deadlines__S, #15 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000007_Part_2_Ch_13_First_Mtg, #16 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000007_Part_3_Ch_13_First_Mtg, #17 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000008_Notice_of_Deficient_Filing_chapter_13_plan_summary_of_assets_schedules_A-J_declaration, #18 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000009_Order_Approving_Application_To_Pay_Filing_Fees_In_Installments, #19 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000010_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Meeting_of_Creditors, #20 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000011_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_to_Creditors_and_Parties_in_Interest, #21 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000012_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #22 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000013_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Ashley_Prager_Popowitz_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Reverse_Mortgage, #23 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000014_Motion_to_Extend_Deadline_to_File_Schedules_Statements_and_Chapter_13_Plan_Filed_by_Debto, #24 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000015_Order_Abating_Motion_To_Extend_Deadline_to_File_Schedules_Statements_and_Chapter_13_Plan, #25 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000016_Order_Setting_Aside_Order_Abating_Motion_to_Extend_Deadline_to_File_Schedules_Statements, #26 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000017_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #27 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000018_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Extend_Deadline_to_File_Schedules_Statements_and_Chapter_13_Plan, #28 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000019_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #29 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000020_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #30 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000021_Notice_of_Filing_of_Payment_7000_Fee_Installment_Paid_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #31 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000022_Response_to_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Extend_Deadline_to_File_Schedules_Statements_and_Cha, #32 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000023_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_for_Failure_to_Attend_Sec_341_Meeting_of_Creditors_and_Provide_Inf, #33 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000024_Order_Dismissing_Case__This_Order_is_Effective_on_the_15th_Day_Following_Date_of_Entry, #34 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000025_Response_to_Trustees_Motion_to_Dismiss_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #35 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000026_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #36 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000027_Request_to_Activate_Debtors_Electronic_Noticing, #37 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000028_Motion_for_Advice_of_Counsel_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #38 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000029_Motion_to_Vacate_Order_Dismissing_Case_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #39 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000030_Motion_to_Recuse_Judge_Funk_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #40 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000031_Response_to_Notice_of_Undeliverable_Mail_for_Reverse_Mortgage_Solutions_Inc_Filed_by_Deb, #41 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000032_Amended_Motion_to_Vacate_Order_Dismissing_Case_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #42 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000033_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Advice_of_Counsel, #43 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000034_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Set_Aside_Order_Dated_April_24_2019_Dismissing_Case, #44 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000035_Notice_of_Rescheduled_Section_341, #45 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000036_Notice_of_the_Deadline_to_file_Proofs_of_Claim_served_upon_all_creditors_and_parties_in_i, #46 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000037_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_on_Confirmation, #47 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000038_Order_Denying_Motion_to_Disqualify_Judge_Jerry_A_Funk, #48 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000039_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing, #49 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000040_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #50 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000041_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #51 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000042_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #52 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000043_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #53 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000044_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #54 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000045_Part_1_Motion_for_Relief_from_Stay, #55 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000045_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #56 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000045_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #57 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000046_Part_1_Motion_for_Relief_from_Co-Debtor_Stay_and_Certificate_of_Service, #58 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000046_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #59 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000046_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #60 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000047_Notice_of_Requirement_to_File_a_Statement_of_Completion_of_Course_in_Personal_Financial_Ma, #61 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000048_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing, #62 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000049_Motion_to_Strike_Reverse_Mortgage_Solutions_Incs_Motion_for_Relief_from_Stay_to_Enforce, #63 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000050_Motion_to_Strike_Reverse_Mortgage_Solutions_Incs_Motion_for_Relief_from_Co-Debtor_Stay_t, #64 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000051_Notice_of_Change_of_Address_for_Mark_Gillespie_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #65 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000052_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_to_Strike_Reverse_Mortgage_Solutions_Incs_Motio, #66 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000053_Notice_and_Order_Scheduling_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Relief_from_the_Stay, #67 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000054_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Relief_from_Co-Debtor_Stay_and_Proo, #68 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000055_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_to_Strike_Reverse_Mortgage_Solutions_Incs_Motion, #69 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000056_Proof_of_Service_of_Notice_and_Order_Scheduling_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Relief_f, #70 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000057_Notice_of_Payment_of_14000_fee_balance_paid_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #71 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000058_Motion_for_Referral_to_Mortgage_Modification_Mediation_with_Reverse_Mortgage_Solutions_In, #72 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000059_Order_Abating_Mortgage_Modification_Mediation_Motion, #73 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000060_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #74 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000061_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #75 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000062_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #76 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000063_Request_by_Pro_Se_Debtor, #77 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000064_Notice_of_Filing_Debtors_Constitutional_Challenges_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #78 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000065_Objection_to_Doc_45_Reverse_Mortgage_Solutions_Incs_Motion_for_Relief_from_Automatic_S, #79 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000066_Motion_to_Cancel_Hearing_for_June_17_2019_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #80 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000067_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Comply_with_Order_Setting_Aside_Order_Dated_April_14_2019_Dismis, #81 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000068_Objection_to_Debtors_Motion_to_Strike_Filed_by_Melbalynn_Fisher_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Rev, #82 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000069_Objection_to_Debtors_Motion_to_Strike_Filed_by_Melbalynn_Fisher_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Rev, #83 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000070_Proof_of_Service_to_the_US_Attorney_by_Certified_Mail_of_Constitutional_Challenges_Filed, #84 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000071_Final_Order_Granting_Debtors_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_comply_with_the_prior_order_of_this, #85 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000072_Service_of_Previously_Entered_OrderNotice_via_Bankruptcy_Noticing_Center_Title_of_Previo, #86 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000073_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_WITNESSES_EVIDENCE_RULING_1_-_4_S, #87 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000074_Notice_of_Section_341, #88 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000075_Order_Scheduling_Trial_1_Motion_for_Relief_from_Stay_by_Reverse_Mortgage_Solutions_Inc, #89 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000076_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #90 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000077_Notice_of_Debtors_Telephone_Number_on_the_Voluntary_Petition_on_Page_8_Required_by_Order, #91 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000078_Tax_Documents_for_the_Year_2015_-_2018_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #92 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000079_Motion_for_Referral_to_Mortgage_Modification_Mediation_with_Reverse_Mortgage_Solutions_In, #93 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000080_Notice_of_Filing_Email_Motion_to_Appear_Telephonically_for_a_Preliminary_Hearing_June_17, #94 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000081_Payment_Advices_for_the_Six_Month_Period_Preceeding_the_Filing_of_this_Petition_Filed_by_D, #95 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000082_Motion_to_Quash_Order_Scheduling_Trial_and_Abate_All_Proceedings_for_Creditor_Reverse_Mort, #96 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000083_Mortgage_Modification_Mediation_Order, #97 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000084_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #98 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000085_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #99 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000086_Notice_of_Filing_Debtors_payment_of_3100_for_Digital_Audio, #100 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000087_Chapter_13_Plan_with_Service_Upon_All_Creditors_via_BNC_Filed_by_Debtor_Neil_Gillespie, #101 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000088_Certificate_of_Debtor_Education_Concerning_Financial_Management_Received_from_Agency_Date, #102 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000089_Notice_of_Filing_Remaining_Schedules_Summary_Statement_and_Chapter_13_Plan_in_Complianc, #103 3-19-bk-00808_Docket_000090_Schedule_ABSchedule_CSchedule_DSchedule_EFSchedule_GSchedule_HSchedule_ISchedule, #104 3-19-bk-00808
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Neil Gillespie. Bankruptcy Court case number 3:19-bk-808-3F3. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 10/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order being appealed)(LMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillespie v. Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Neil Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Melbalynn Fisher
Represented By: Ashley Prager Popowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?