Bussmann v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Robert Lindsay Bussmann
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00659
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Northern District of California as case 3:20-cv-850, filed on 2/5/2020. (LMF)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case (CTO-179) to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: 2741. (LAB)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (LAB)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2741, In re: In re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 1/2/2020, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket sheet) (LAB)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Robert Lindsay Bussmann. (Chambers, G.)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robert Lindsay Bussmann. Related case(s): yes (Chambers, G.)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/27/2019. (SMB)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:19-cv-659-Oc-30PRL. (SJB)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16296871) filed by Robert Lindsay Bussmann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chambers, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bussmann v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lindsay Bussmann
Represented By: G. Katherine Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?