Record v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Latasha Record
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00053
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Speedway LLC. Related case(s): No (Shebib, Abood) Modified on 4/6/2020 (HAI).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion to Conduct Case Management Conference by Telephone. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/2/2020. (SMB)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Conduct Case Management Conference By Telephone by Speedway LLC. (Shebib, Abood)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Latasha Record. Related case(s): yes (Henson, James)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Latasha Record. (Henson, James)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases (Pdf removed, filed by counsel in wrong case. Refiled at doc. 8. (Henson, James) Modified on 3/5/2020 (LAB).
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Speedway LLC.(Shebib, Abood)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/20/2020. (KAC)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Speedway LLC. (LAB)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:20-cv-53-Oc-30ORL. (SJB)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Speedway LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16452328) filed by Latasha Record. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Henson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Record v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Record
Represented By: James J. Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Abood Shebib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?