Richard C Wagner v. Mark J. Yerman
Plaintiff: Richard C. Wagner
Defendant: Mark J. Yerman
Case Number: 5:2020cv00327
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Dkt. #4) of the Magistrate Judge is adopted, confirmed, and approved in all respects and is made a part of this order for all purposes, including appellate review. Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. #2) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion to Set the Case for Trial (Dkt. #5) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. #1) is DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/31/2020. (SMB)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations and MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to set this case for trial by Richard C. Wagner. (HAI) ***Document not signed
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/3/2020. (SA)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(RLK)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Richard C. Wagner. (RLK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark J. Yerman filed by Richard C. Wagner. (one service copy provided)(RLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard C Wagner v. Mark J. Yerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard C. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Yerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?