Tippett et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Ingrid Tippett and Philip Tippett
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00342
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to set briefing schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Holladay-Tobias, Sara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Motion for Class Certification #20 is GRANTED. A new deadline for Plaintiffs to file a motion for class certification will be set in the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/17/2020. (AMP)
September 16, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint Pursuant To Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(6), 8(A), and 9(B) and Incorporated Memorandum Of Law by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Holladay-Tobias, Sara)
September 16, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ingrid Tippett, Philip Tippett. (Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 21 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Ingrid Tippett, Philip Tippett. (Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification by Ingrid Tippett, Philip Tippett. (Widlanski, Benjamin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Holladay-Tobias, Sara)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16, #17 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/11/2020. (SA)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Kobi K. Brinson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17274779 for $150 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Holladay-Tobias, Sara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Amanda L. Groves to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17274364 for $150 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Holladay-Tobias, Sara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER: #14 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant shall have until September 16, 2020, to file a response to the Complaint #1. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/25/2020. (AMP)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Holladay-Tobias, Sara)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittney Lauren Difato on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Difato, Brittney)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara F. Holladay-Tobias on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Holladay-Tobias, Sara)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 8/4/2020 by Philip Tippett, Ingrid Tippett as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.( See doc 10) (RLK)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Ingrid Tippett, Philip Tippett (Widlanski, Benjamin)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (RLK)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Ingrid Tippett, Philip Tippett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Widlanski, Benjamin)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert John Neary on behalf of Ingrid Tippett, Philip Tippett (Neary, Robert)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by George Franjola on behalf of Ingrid Tippett, Philip Tippett (Franjola, George)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Judge Brian J. Davis. New case number: 5:20-cv-342-Oc-39PRL. Judge James S. Moody, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (LMF)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of recusal. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to reassign this case to another District Judge under the blind filing system established pursuant to the rules of this Court. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/28/2020. (SMB)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:20-cv-342-Oc-30PRL. (SJB)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17106834) filed by Philip Tippett, Ingrid Tippett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tippett Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B - Equityline Agreement, #3 Exhibit C- HELOC Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Correction, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Widlanski, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tippett et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Tippett
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Represented By: Robert John Neary
Represented By: George Franjola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Tippett
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Represented By: Robert John Neary
Represented By: George Franjola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Amanda L. Groves
Represented By: Brittney Lauren Difato
Represented By: Kobi K. Brinson
Represented By: Sara F. Holladay-Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?