Dorisma et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Renette Dorisma and Yonel Dorival
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli, Acting Secretary Chad Wolf, Ken Cuccinelli and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 5:2020cv00383
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Yonel Dorival, Renette Dorisma. All Defendants. (Stoller, David)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Yonel Dorival, Renette Dorisma. Chad Wolf served on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Acting Secretary Summons Executed)(Stoller, David)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Yonel Dorival, Renette Dorisma. Ken Cuccinelli served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Acting Director Summons Executed)(Stoller, David)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Ken Cuccinelli. (LAB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Chad Wolf. (LAB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Renette Dorisma, Yonel Dorival. Related case(s): yes (Stoller, David)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/18/2020. (KAC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:20-cv-383-Oc-30PRL. (SJB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17194834) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet Signed, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit Receipt Notice Form I-130, #5 Exhibit Receipt Notice Form I-485, #6 Exhibit USCIS Web Portal information relating Form I-130, #7 Exhibit USCIS Web Portal information relating Form I-485, #8 Exhibit Processing Times, #9 Exhibit Processing Reports)(Stoller, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorisma et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renette Dorisma
Represented By: David Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yonel Dorival
Represented By: David Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?