Shaw v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Janet Shaw
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Ortho, LLC, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Teva Branded Pharmaceuticals Products R&D, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00390
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Stay (Dkt. #9) is granted. The case is stayed pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's ruling on the motion to transfer the case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. The Clerk is directed to administratively close this case. The parties are directed to file a joint status report within fourteen (14) days after the ruling on the motion to transfer, which should update the Court of the status of this case and request a lift of the stay, if applicable. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 10/13/2020. (SMB)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Stay of All Proceedings Pending a Decision on MDL Centralization and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Janet Shaw. (Cohen, Jonathan)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall file a response to #9 Defendant's Motion for a Stay of All Proceedings Pending a Decision on MDL Centralization within seven (7) days of the date of this Order or the Court will consider the Motion unopposed. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 10/13/2020. (SMB)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Walz, David)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay of All Proceedings Pending a Decision on MDL Centralization and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Walz, David)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, and Janssen Ortho, LLC. This cause is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, and Janssen Ortho, LLC. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, and Janssen Ortho, LLC. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/24/2020. (SMB)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Janet Shaw (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendants Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Teva Branded Pharmaceuticals Products R&D, Inc. This cause is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendants Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Teva Branded Pharmaceuticals Products R&D, Inc. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendants Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Teva Branded Pharmaceuticals Products R&D, Inc. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/22/2020. (SMB)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Janet Shaw (Cohen, Jonathan)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (LAB)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/24/2020. (KAC)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:20-cv-390-Oc-30PRL. (SJB)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17212619) filed by Janet Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons)(Cohen, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceuticals Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Shaw
Represented By: Jonathan Betten Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?