Sona et al v. City of Ocala, Florida et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Sona and Tom Kuehn
Defendant: Shelby Batchelor, Eli Serrano-Prusinski, City of Ocala, Florida, Arriahana Griffin, Jose M. Gonzalez, Jr., Walton Lowery, Shawn Minucci, Sandra Wilson, Sheriff William Woods and Chris Rafferty
Case Number: 5:2021cv00009
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss this action with prejudice filed by Tom Kuehn, Kevin Sona. (Katz, David)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER granting #30 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Response of More Than 20 Pages. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a response to the Amended Motion to Dismiss not to exceed twenty-five (25) pages. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/1/2021. (SMB)
March 1, 2021 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages re #19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Tom Kuehn, Kevin Sona. (Katz, David) Modified on 3/1/2021 (HAI).
February 25, 2021 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss is extended to 3/1/2021. Response due by 3/1/2021. (LAB)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER granting #28 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss is extended to March 1, 2021. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/24/2021. (SMB)
February 24, 2021 Filing 28 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file a RESPONSE to #19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss this action with prejudice filed by Tom Kuehn, Kevin Sona. (Katz, David) Modified on 2/24/2021 (MJT).
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/30/2021; Dispositive motions due by 12/31/2021; Conduct mediation hearing by 12/31/2021. (Parties have agreed for Terry Silverman to serve as mediator.); TELEPHONIC Pretrial Conference set for THURSDAY, MARCH 3, 2022, at 9:00 AM. before Judge James S. Moody, Jr. The parties shall coordinate a telephonic conference call and contact Chambers at (813) 301-5680. Jury Trial set on the APRIL 2022 trial term before Judge James S. Moody Jr. in Courtroom TBD of the United States Courthouse, 207 N.W. Second Street, First Floor, Ocala, FL, 34475. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/16/2021. (SMB)
February 12, 2021 Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Katz, David)
February 12, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Walton Lowery, Chris Rafferty, Eli Serrano-Prusinski, William Woods. (Poulton, Thomas)
February 11, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Shelby Batchelor, City of Ocala, Florida, Jose M. Gonzalez, Jr., Arriahana Griffin, Shawn Minucci, Sandra Wilson. (Gilligan, Patrick)
February 11, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Tom Kuehn. (Katz, David)
February 11, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Appearance by David S. Katz on behalf of Tom Kuehn (Katz, David)
February 11, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kevin Sona. (Katz, David)
February 11, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Appearance by David S. Katz on behalf of Kevin Sona (Katz, David)
February 4, 2021 Filing 19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss this action with prejudice by City of Ocala, Florida, Sandra Wilson, Shawn Minucci, Jose M. Gonzalez, Jr., Shelby Batchelor and Arriahana Griffin. (Gilligan, Patrick) Modified on 2/5/2021 (LAB).
February 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to February 4, 2021. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/2/2021. (SMB)
February 1, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Shelby Batchelor, City of Ocala, Florida, Jose M. Gonzalez, Jr., Arriahana Griffin, Shawn Minucci, Sandra Wilson. (Gilligan, Patrick)
February 1, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Walton Lowery, Chris Rafferty, Eli Serrano-Prusinski, William Woods.(Poulton, Thomas)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/1/2021. (SMB)
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Shelby Batchelor, City of Ocala, Florida, Jose M. Gonzalez, Jr., Arriahana Griffin, Shawn Minucci, Sandra Wilson. (Gilligan, Patrick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice Amended per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tom Kuehn. Related case(s): y (Phillips, James) Modified on 1/20/2021 (LAB).
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice Amended per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kevin Sona. Related case(s): y (Phillips, James) Modified on 1/20/2021 (LAB).
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Shelby Batchelor, City of Ocala, Florida, Jose M. Gonzalez, Jr., Arriahana Griffin, Shawn Minucci, Sandra Wilson. Related case(s): yes (Gilligan, Patrick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Walton Lowery, Chris Rafferty, Eli Serrano-Prusinski, William Woods. Related case(s): yes (Poulton, Thomas)
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tom Kuehn. Related case(s): n (Phillips, James)
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kevin Sona. Related case(s): no (Phillips, James)
January 11, 2021 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for All Defendants. Answer due by 2/1/2021. (LAB)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Joint Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to February 1, 2021. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/8/2021. (SMB)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (JOINT) by All Defendants. (Holborn, Robert)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Amended Notice to Fix Scrivener's Error at Paragraphs 5 and 8 filed by All Defendants.(Poulton, Thomas) Modified on 1/6/2021 (LAB).
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/5/2021. (KAC)
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:21-cv-0009-Oc-30PRL. (SJB)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Circuit Court, case number 2020-ca-001916 filed in State Court on 12-02-2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17729183 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Poulton, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sona et al v. City of Ocala, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby Batchelor
Represented By: Patrick G. Gilligan
Represented By: Robert D. Holborn
Represented By: Gwendolyn Pasteur Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Serrano-Prusinski
Represented By: Thomas W. Poulton
Represented By: Robert D. Holborn
Represented By: Patrick G. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ocala, Florida
Represented By: Patrick G. Gilligan
Represented By: Robert D. Holborn
Represented By: Gwendolyn Pasteur Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arriahana Griffin
Represented By: Patrick G. Gilligan
Represented By: Robert D. Holborn
Represented By: Gwendolyn Pasteur Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose M. Gonzalez, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick G. Gilligan
Represented By: Robert D. Holborn
Represented By: Gwendolyn Pasteur Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walton Lowery
Represented By: Thomas W. Poulton
Represented By: Robert D. Holborn
Represented By: Patrick G. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Minucci
Represented By: Patrick G. Gilligan
Represented By: Robert D. Holborn
Represented By: Gwendolyn Pasteur Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Wilson
Represented By: Patrick G. Gilligan
Represented By: Robert D. Holborn
Represented By: Gwendolyn Pasteur Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff William Woods
Represented By: Thomas W. Poulton
Represented By: Robert D. Holborn
Represented By: Patrick G. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Rafferty
Represented By: Thomas W. Poulton
Represented By: Robert D. Holborn
Represented By: Patrick G. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Sona
Represented By: James D Phillips, Jr
Represented By: David S. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Kuehn
Represented By: James D Phillips, Jr
Represented By: David S. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?