Luebke et al v. City of Ocala
Plaintiff: Victor Hoyt Cox, Patrick McArdle, Kimberly Burnham, William Anthony Taylor, Roger Luebke and Dustin Damico
Defendant: City of Ocala
Not Classified By Court: Charles B Carter
Case Number: 5:2021cv00219
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
2 Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: This case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 11/1/2021. (Conway, Anne)
October 29, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Kimberly Burnham, Victor Hoyt Cox, Dustin Damico, Roger Luebke, Patrick McArdle, William Anthony Taylor. (Siegel, Jodi)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: PLEASE NOTE: This Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order contains SIGNIFICANT changes to dates and other important obligations of counsel. Counsel MUST READ the entire Order carefully and update calendars accordingly. Discovery due by 10/3/2022 Dispositive motions due by 10/14/2022 Pretrial statement due by 2/17/2023 All other motions due by 11/14/2022 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 7/2/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 8/2/2022 Bench Trial set for trial term which commences on 4/3/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 A before Judge Anne C. Conway.Mediation completed. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 10/18/2021. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
October 1, 2021 Filing 22 Case Reassigned to Judge Anne C. Conway. New case number: 5:21-cv-219-ACC-PRL. Judge James S. Moody, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (MJT)
July 15, 2021 Filing 21 MEDIATION report Hearing held on 7/14/21. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Gilligan, Patrick)
July 15, 2021 Filing 20 MEDIATION report Hearing held on 7/14/21. Hearing outcome: Adjourned.. (Dunn, Chelsea)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Unopposed MOTION for Kirsten Anderson to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kirsten Anderson is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. Attorney Jodi Siegel shall be substituted as lead counsel in this matter. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/14/2021. (SMB)
July 14, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Kirsten Anderson to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Kirsten)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER appointing Charles B. Carter as mediator in this action. Mediation conference is scheduled for July 14, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. via Zoom. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/22/2021. (SMB)
June 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Charles B. Carter as mediator by Kimberly Burnham, Victor Hoyt Cox, Dustin Damico, Roger Luebke, Patrick McArdle, William Anthony Taylor. (Dunn, Chelsea)
June 22, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on July 14, 2021 before Charles Carter. (Carter, Charles)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/1/2022; Dispositive motions due by 6/1/2022; TELEPHONIC Pretrial Conference set for THURSDAY, DECEMBER 1, 2022, at 11:15 AM before Judge James S. Moody, Jr. The parties shall coordinate a telephonic conference call and contact Chambers at (813) 301-5680. Bench Trial set on the JANUARY 2023 trial term in Ocala Courtroom TBD before Judge James S. Moody, Jr. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/15/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/14/2021. (KAC)
June 10, 2021 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Dunn, Chelsea)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/17/2021. (SMB)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by City of Ocala. (Gilligan, Patrick)
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by City of Ocala.(Gilligan, Patrick)
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City of Ocala. (Gilligan, Patrick)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 4/23/2021 by Patrick McArdle, Roger Luebke, Victor Hoyt Cox, William Anthony Taylor, Kimberly Burnham, Dustin Damico as to All Defendants. (Dunn, Chelsea)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF of service by Kimberly Burnham, Victor Hoyt Cox, Dustin Damico, Roger Luebke, Patrick McArdle, William Anthony Taylor (Dunn, Chelsea) Counsel called and will refile as Return of Service Executed. Modified on 4/27/2021 (LMF).
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kimberly Burnham, Victor Hoyt Cox, Dustin Damico, Roger Luebke, Patrick McArdle, William Anthony Taylor. (Dunn, Chelsea)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kimberly Burnham, Victor Hoyt Cox, Dustin Damico, Roger Luebke, Patrick McArdle, William Anthony Taylor. Related case(s): No (Dunn, Chelsea)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (SMB)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to City of Ocala. (LAB)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:21-cv-0219-JSM-PRL. (SJB)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BFLMDC-18151900) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ordinance 5797, #2 Exhibit Ordinance 2012-31, #3 Exhibit Ordinance 2019-2, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Dunn, Chelsea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luebke et al v. City of Ocala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Hoyt Cox
Represented By: Chelsea Dunn
Represented By: Jacqueline Nicole Azis
Represented By: Jodi Lynn Siegel
Represented By: Daniel B. Tilley
Represented By: Kirsten Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick McArdle
Represented By: Chelsea Dunn
Represented By: Jacqueline Nicole Azis
Represented By: Jodi Lynn Siegel
Represented By: Daniel B. Tilley
Represented By: Kirsten Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Burnham
Represented By: Chelsea Dunn
Represented By: Jacqueline Nicole Azis
Represented By: Jodi Lynn Siegel
Represented By: Daniel B. Tilley
Represented By: Kirsten Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Anthony Taylor
Represented By: Chelsea Dunn
Represented By: Jacqueline Nicole Azis
Represented By: Jodi Lynn Siegel
Represented By: Daniel B. Tilley
Represented By: Kirsten Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Luebke
Represented By: Chelsea Dunn
Represented By: Jacqueline Nicole Azis
Represented By: Jodi Lynn Siegel
Represented By: Daniel B. Tilley
Represented By: Kirsten Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Damico
Represented By: Chelsea Dunn
Represented By: Jacqueline Nicole Azis
Represented By: Jodi Lynn Siegel
Represented By: Daniel B. Tilley
Represented By: Kirsten Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ocala
Represented By: Patrick G. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Charles B Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?