Edgar County Watchdogs, Inc et al v. Kurowski et al
Plaintiff: Alyssia Benford, Edgar County Watchdogs, Inc, John Kraft and Kirk Alen
Defendant: ILReporter, LLC, Fight for IL, INC, Erik Phelps and Bonnie Kurowski
Case Number: 5:2021cv00302
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Philip R Lammens
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Fight for IL, INC, ILReporter, LLC, Bonnie Kurowski, Erik Phelps. (RLK)
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Kirk Alen, Alyssia Benford, Edgar County Watchdogs, Inc, John Kraft. (Hanlon, Robert)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Kirk Alen, Alyssia Benford, Edgar County Watchdogs, Inc, John Kraft. (Hanlon, Robert)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Kirk Alen, Alyssia Benford, Edgar County Watchdogs, Inc, John Kraft. (Hanlon, Robert)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Kirk Alen, Alyssia Benford, Edgar County Watchdogs, Inc, John Kraft. (Hanlon, Robert)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/9/2021. (JWM)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC)
June 2, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Robert T. Hanlon, appearing on behalf of Edgar County Watchdogs, Inc, Kirk Alen, John Kraft, and Alyssia Benford (Filing fee $150 receipt number OCA-11966.) Related document: #2 MOTION for Robert T. Hanlon to appear pro hac vice. (RLK)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Robert T. Hanlon to appear pro hac vice.. (RLK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fight for IL, INC, ILReporter, LLC, Bonnie Kurowski, Erik Phelps with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number OCA-11965 filed by Edgar County Watchdogs, Inc, Kirk Alen, Alyssia Benford, John Kraft. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgar County Watchdogs, Inc et al v. Kurowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssia Benford
Represented By: Robert T Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar County Watchdogs, Inc
Represented By: Robert T Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kraft
Represented By: Robert T Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Alen
Represented By: Robert T Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILReporter, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fight for IL, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Kurowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?