Holmes v. The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: CHRYSTAL HOLMES, Gerald Fink, Alexander Roshell and Denise Kinsey
Defendant: THE VILLAGES TRI-COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, INC. d/b/a UF HEALTH CENTRAL FLORIDA, LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. d/b/a UF HEAL TH CENTRAL FLORIDA, CENTRAL FLORIDA HEALTH, INC. d/b/a UF HEALTH CENTRAL FLORIDA, The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc. doing business as UF Health Central Florida, Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc., doing business as UF Health Central Florida, Central Florida Health, Inc. doing business as Health Central Florida and Central Florida Health, Inc. doing business as UF Health Central Florida
Case Number: 5:2021cv00508
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Central Florida Health, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc.,, The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - In re USAA Data Sec. Litig. Order)(Pearson, Matthew)
November 11, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law , Third by Gerald Fink, Chrystal Holmes, Denise Kinsey, Alexander Roshell. (Yanchunis, John)
September 26, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Response to plaintiff's supplemental authority by Central Florida Health, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc.,, The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc. re #44 Notice of filing supplemental authority, #43 Notice of filing supplemental authority (Pearson, Matthew) Modified on 9/27/2022 (HAI).
September 12, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE of supplemental authority by Gerald Fink, Chrystal Holmes, Denise Kinsey, Alexander Roshell. (Maxey, Ryan)
September 12, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of supplemental authority by Gerald Fink, Chrystal Holmes, Denise Kinsey, Alexander Roshell. (Maxey, Ryan)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Out-of-State Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Matthew D. Pearson may specially appear in this case as counsel for Defendants; Attorney Pearson shall immediately begin using the CM/ECF docket system and begin filing electronically; Counsel must register for a CM/ECF login and password through the website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under "CM/ECF." Once registered for CM/ECF and added as counsel of record in this case, counsel will receive the Notice of Electronic Filing [NEF] on all documents. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Attorney Pearson.. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 8/5/2022. (BRS)
August 4, 2022 Filing 41 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge John Antoon II: MOTION HEARING held on 8/4/2022 re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc., Central Florida Health, Inc.. Court Reporter: Nikki L. Peters (AKC)
August 4, 2022 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew D. Pearson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19848301 for $150 by All Defendants. (Brady, Julie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
July 19, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2022 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II. One hour has been set aside for this hearing. If counsel would request the hearing be held via ZOOM they must do so in writing and file a joint notice with the court by 5 p.m. on 8/1/22. (AKC)
April 1, 2022 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Central Florida Health, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc.,, The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Defendants may file an 8 page or fewer reply by 4/1/22. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/24/2022. (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC)
March 22, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Renewed Motion for Leave to File Reply In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint by Central Florida Health, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc.,, The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying without prejudice #33 Motion for Leave to File Reply for failure to comply with Local Rules 3.01(d) and 3:01(g). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/21/2022. (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC)
March 17, 2022 Filing 34 REQUEST for oral argument re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Central Florida Health, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc.,, The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie)
March 16, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically leave to file reply iso motion to dismiss by Central Florida Health, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc.,, The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie)
March 11, 2022 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Gerald Fink, Chrystal Holmes, Denise Kinsey, Alexander Roshell. (Yanchunis, John)
February 18, 2022 Case Stayed. (LMF)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER requiring Plaintiffs to respond to #25 Motion to Dismiss on or before March 11, 2022; granting #26 Motion to Stay the Action Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; and staying this case, including discovery, pending ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/17/2022. (EK)
February 16, 2022 Filing 30 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re #27 Order on Motion to Stay re Applicability of CAFA Exceptions filed by Gerald Fink, Chrystal Holmes, Denise Kinsey, Alexander Roshell. (Yanchunis, John) Modified on 2/17/2022 (RLK).
February 16, 2022 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Heather Noonan re #27 Order on Motion to Stay, #28 Memorandum in support by The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie) Modified on 2/17/2022 (RLK).
February 16, 2022 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in support re #27 Order on Motion to Stay Regarding Jurisdiction Under the Class Action Fairness Act filed by The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie) Modified on 2/17/2022 (RLK).
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying without prejudice #26 Motion to Stay; suspending case deadlines; and requiring briefing from the parties no later than February 16, 2022. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/26/2022. (EK)
January 10, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Action Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Collignon, Casie) Modified on 1/11/2022 (RLK).
January 10, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Central Florida Health, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc.,, The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie)
January 5, 2022 Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Collignon, Casie)
December 23, 2021 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for All Defendants. Answer to Amended Complaint due by 1/10/2022. (HAI)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: the parties shall file an amended Uniform Case Management Report that reflects an agreement on the proposed dates within fourteen days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/22/2021. (BRS)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #17 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/21/2021. (EK)
December 20, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #17 Amended Complaint by Central Florida Health, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc.,, The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie)
December 16, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie)
December 16, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order Disclosure Statement by Gerald Fink, Chrystal Holmes, Denise Kinsey, Alexander Roshell. (Yanchunis, John)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying as moot #12 Motion to Dismiss in light of #17 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/13/2021. (EK)
December 10, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Privacy Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Website Notice)(Yanchunis, John)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Plaintiff and Defendant The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc. shall each file their Disclosure Statement within seven days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/9/2021. (BRS)
November 30, 2021 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Yanchunis, John)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report; the deadline to file the Case Management Report is extended to November 30, 2021. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/24/2021. (BRS)
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Chrystal Holmes. (Yanchunis, John)
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Central Florida Health, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc.,, The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan D. Maxey on behalf of Chrystal Holmes (Maxey, Ryan)
November 2, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Central Florida Health, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Baker & Hostetler, LLP, Other Affiliate THE VILLAGES TRI-COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, INC. d/b/a UF HEALTH CENTRAL FLORIDA, Other Affiliate LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. d/b/a UF HEAL TH CENTRAL FLORIDA for Central Florida Health, Inc... (Brady, Julie)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc., identifying Other Affiliate Baker & Hostetler, LLP, Other Affiliate THE VILLAGES TRI-COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, INC. d/b/a UF HEALTH CENTRAL FLORIDA, Other Affiliate Central Florida Health Inc. d/b/a UF Health Central Florida for Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc.,.. (Brady, Julie)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 10/28/2021. (SA)
October 27, 2021 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18861049 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Casie D. Collignon. (Brady, Julie)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Casie D. Collignon to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Brady, Julie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Defendants Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc. and Central Florida Health, Inc. Disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 10/20/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; Defendants shall respond to the Complaint no later than November 19, 2021. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 10/20/2021. (BRS)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal by All Defendants. (Brady, Julie)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL CASE ORDER for Plaintiff and Defendant The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc. - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 10/15/2021. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:21-cv-508-JA-PRL. (LMW)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18817898 filed by THE VILLAGES TRI-COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, INC. d/b/a UF HEALTH CENTRAL FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit Summons and Proof of Service, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brady, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRYSTAL HOLMES
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis
Represented By: Ryan D. Maxey
Represented By: Ryan D Maxey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Fink
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis
Represented By: Ryan D Maxey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Roshell
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis
Represented By: Ryan D Maxey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Kinsey
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis
Represented By: Ryan D Maxey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE VILLAGES TRI-COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, INC. d/b/a UF HEALTH CENTRAL FLORIDA
Represented By: Julie Singer Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. d/b/a UF HEAL TH CENTRAL FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL FLORIDA HEALTH, INC. d/b/a UF HEALTH CENTRAL FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc. doing business as UF Health Central Florida
Represented By: Julie Singer Brady
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc., doing business as UF Health Central Florida
Represented By: Julie Singer Brady
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Florida Health, Inc. doing business as Health Central Florida
Represented By: Julie Singer Brady
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Florida Health, Inc. doing business as UF Health Central Florida
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Represented By: Julie Singer Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?