Shadow Oaks, LLP v. City of Ocala et al
Plaintiff: Shadow Oaks, LLP
Defendant: City of Ocala and Jennipher L Buller
Case Number: 5:2021cv00564
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Anne C Conway
2 Judge: Philip R Lammens
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Gwendolyn Pasteur Williams on behalf of Jennipher L Buller, City of Ocala (Williams, Gwendolyn)
January 14, 2022 Filing 21 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/14/2022. (DIGITAL (Zoom)) (MJT)
January 14, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick G. Gilligan on behalf of Jennipher L Buller, City of Ocala (Gilligan, Patrick)
January 13, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on June 14, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. before R. William Futch.(Green, Edwin)
January 11, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of hearing: re: #17 ORDER referring case to Magistrate Judge Lammens to conduct a preliminary pretrial conference. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2022 at 09:30 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Counsel will receive the zoom invite via email. (MJT)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER referring case to Magistrate Judge Lammens to conduct a preliminary pretrial conference pursuant to FRCP 26. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/10/2022. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
January 10, 2022 Filing 16 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Lead counsel shall contact opposing counsel, select a mediator off the court's approved mediator list on the court's website, contact mediator to schedule mediation and file a notice with the court within 14 days advising the court of the selected mediator and scheduled mediation date. (counsel emailed) (AKC)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2022 Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2022 Discovery due by 9/2/2022 Dispositive motions due by 9/14/2022 Pretrial statement due by 1/24/2023 All other motions due by 10/14/2022 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 5/31/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 6/30/2022 Jury Trial set for the trial term which commences on 3/1/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 A before Judge Anne C. Conway. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/31/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/10/2022. (AKC)
January 6, 2022 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Green, Edwin)
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Jennipher L Buller, City of Ocala identifying Corporate Parent Gilligan, Gooding, Batsel, Anderson & Phelan, P.A. for City of Ocala, Jennipher L Buller. (Gilligan, Patrick)
December 16, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to affirmative defenses by Shadow Oaks, LLP. (Green, Edwin)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL CASE ORDER for Defendants - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/14/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
December 13, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Jennipher L Buller, City of Ocala.(Gilligan, Patrick)
December 7, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Ocala and Jennipher L. Buller with Jury Demand. filed by Shadow Oaks, LLP. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Shadow Oaks, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Green, Edwin) Modified on 12/8/2021 (RLK).
December 2, 2021 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Judge Anne C. Conway. New case number: 5:21-cv-00564-ACC-PRL. Judge John Antoon II no longer assigned to the case. (LAB)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER transferring case to the Honorable Anne C. Conway. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/1/2021. (EK)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Shadow Oaks, LLP identifying Corporate Parent City of Ocala, Corporate Parent Blanchard, Merriam, Adel, Kirkland & Green, P.A., Corporate Parent Gilligan, Gooding, Batsel, Anderson & Phelan, P.A., Other Affiliate Patrick G Gilligan, Other Affiliate Jennipher L Buller, Other Affiliate Nathan Whittaker, Other Affiliate Edwin A Green, III for Shadow Oaks, LLP. (Green, Edwin)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Shadow Oaks, LLP. Related case(s): Yes (Green, Edwin)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER of service returned executed on 11/18/2021 by Jennipher L Buller, City of Ocala as to Jennipher L Buller, City of Ocala. (Gilligan, Patrick)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/17/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:21-cv-564-JA-PRL. (LMW)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18935226) filed by Shadow Oaks, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Green, Edwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shadow Oaks, LLP v. City of Ocala et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shadow Oaks, LLP
Represented By: Edwin A. Green, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ocala
Represented By: Gwendolyn Pasteur Williams
Represented By: Patrick G. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennipher L Buller
Represented By: Gwendolyn Pasteur Williams
Represented By: Patrick G. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?